Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. Priority Mortgage Corp. and Senior Lending Corpora
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01079 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Priority Mortgage Corp. and Senior Lending Corporation, as successor to Priority Mortgage Corp.
|
Represented By
Priority Mortgage Corp. and Senior Lending Corporation, as successor to Priority Mortgage Corp.
contact info |
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
So Ordered Stipulation
Fri 05/07 11:37 AM
So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 5/7/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/07 11:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1079 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice, Adjournment of Hearing
Tue 04/20 5:17 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Priority Mortgage Corp. et al filed by Olivia Italiano on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Italiano, Olivia) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 03/30 11:54 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference to be held on 5/20/2021 (check with court for location), Answer due by 4/29/2021, (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 03/26 9:16 AM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
||
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 03/22 10:34 PM
Amended Complaint against Priority Mortgage Corp. and Senior Lending Corporation, as successor to Priority Mortgage Corp. Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 03/09 11:50 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), Answer due by 4/8/2021, (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 03/05 7:48 PM
Adversary case 21-01079 Complaint against Priority Mortgage Corp. and Senior Lending Corporation, as successor to Priority Mortgage Corp. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |