Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. All California Mortgage, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01088 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
All California Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
American Pacific Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to All California Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
American Pacific Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to All California Mortgage, Inc.
contact info |
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
277 Park Avenue, 46th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 03/11 9:33 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1088 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Wed 03/10 5:54 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Fri 03/05 10:15 PM
Adversary case 21-01088 Complaint against All California Mortgage, Inc., American Pacific Mortgage Corporation, as successor by merger to All California Mortgage, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Adam M Bialek, William A Maher, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |