Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-02784

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David M Warren
Case #: 5:21-ap-00034
Nature of Suit31 Bankruptcy - Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - §363(h)
Case Filed:Mar 08, 2021
Terminated:May 24, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Randall Miller
514 America's Way #13091
Box Elder, SD 57719
Represented By
Randall Miller
contact info
Defendant
Jason Garrison
9607 Belmont Lane
Waxhaw, NC 28173
Represented By
Jason Garrison
contact info
Defendant
Christina Matthis Bentley
2288 Glenkirk Drive
Burlington, NC 27215
Represented By
Christina Matthis Bentley
contact info
Defendant
Michael Keith Bentley
2288 Glenkirk Drive
Burlington, NC 27215
Represented By
Michael Keith Bentley
contact info
Defendant
James B. Scott
1150 Landings Loop
Tallahassee, FL 32311
Represented By
James B. Scott
contact info
Defendant
Terrence Dyer
6422 Braymoore Drive
Galena, OH 43021
Represented By
Terrence Dyer
contact info
Defendant
Steven J. Jencik
3203 Nuttree Woods Drive
Midlothian, VA 23112
Represented By
Steven J. Jencik
contact info
Defendant
Suzanne L. Jencik
3203 Nuttree Woods Drive
Midlothian, VA 23112
Represented By
Suzanne L. Jencik
contact info
Defendant
Foxcroft Holdings, LLC
PO Box 711
Pinehurst, NC 28370
Represented By
Foxcroft Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Golf South Clubs, LLC
PO Box 711
Pinehurst, NC 28370
Represented By
Golf South Clubs, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.
207 West Millbrook Road, Ste 110
Raleigh, NC 27609
Represented By
Hope Derby Carmichael
Jordan Price Wall Gray Jones & Carlton
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Thursday, January 06, 2022
crtbatch Judge Transfer Thu 01/06 8:45 AM
Notice of Transfer of Case from Judge Stephani W. Humrickhouse to Judge David M. Warren. (Roberson, Tina)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
court Returned Mail (Text) Mon 05/24 7:16 AM
Notification of Returned Mail by BNC addressed to Defendants Foxcroft Holdings, LLC, GolfSouth Clubs, LLC. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.17 Order on Motions for Default Judgment
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/24 1:43 PM
Adversary Case 5:21-ap-34 Closed (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 09, 2021
18 18 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Mon 05/10 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 05/09/2021. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, May 07, 2021
17 17 order Default Judgment Fri 05/07 2:23 PM
Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Christina Matthis Bentley , Michael Keith Bentley , Terrence Dyer , Foxcroft Holdings, LLC , Jason Garrison , Golf South Clubs, LLC , Randall Miller , James B. Scott Related [+] (Crossman, Ahronda). **Corrective Entry: Order Granting Motion. Default Judgment as to Christina Matthis Bentley, Michael Keith Bentley, Terrence Dyer, Foxcroft Holdings, LLC, Jason Garrison, Golf South Clubs, LLC, Randall Miller, James B. Scott.** Modified on 5/7/2021 (Skinner, Donna)
Related: [-] 15 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff,15 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
16 16 court Entry of Default Tue 05/04 9:50 AM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
15 15 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/28 4:12 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Foxcroft Holdings, LLC, Golf South Clubs, LLC, In Addition To Motion for Default Judgment as to Foxcroft Holdings, LLC, Golf South Clubs, LLC filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 27, 2021
14 14 misc Affidavit Tue 04/27 3:45 PM
Affidavit of Service of Process by Publication filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
13 13 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 04/15 4:36 PM
Amended/Amendment to Summons Service Executed on Foxcroft Holdings, LLC 3/10/2021; Golf South Clubs, LLC 3/10/2021. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
12 12 court Entry of Default Tue 04/13 12:42 PM
Entry of Default Related [+] (Shum-Drake, Kelly)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.
Thursday, April 08, 2021
11 11 motion Entry of Default Thu 04/08 2:20 PM
Motion for Entry of Default as to Christina Matthis Bentley, Michael Keith Bentley, Terrence Dyer, Jason Garrison, Randall Miller, James B. Scott filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 04/07 2:11 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Steven J. Jencik, Suzanne L. Jencik filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 03/24 4:54 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by T. Nute Thompson on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Thompson, T. Nute)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/12 3:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Foxcroft Holdings, LLC 3/10/2021; Golf South Clubs, LLC 3/10/2021. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/11 4:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Christina Matthis Bentley 3/10/2021; Michael Keith Bentley 3/10/2021; Terrence Dyer 3/10/2021; Jason Garrison 3/10/2021; Steven J. Jencik 3/10/2021; Suzanne L. Jencik 3/10/2021; Randall Miller 3/10/2021; James B. Scott 3/10/2021. filed by Hope Derby Carmichael on behalf of Christina Matthis Bentley ; Michael Keith Bentley ; Terrence Dyer ; Jason Garrison ; Steven J. Jencik ; Suzanne L. Jencik ; Randall Miller ; James B. Scott. (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 03/10 1:46 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Rebecca F. Redwine on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] dwine, Rebecca
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 03/10 1:46 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin E.F.B. Waller on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Waller, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance Wed 03/10 1:45 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc.. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 03/09 1:07 PM
Summons Issued on Foxcroft Holdings, LLC Answer Due 4/23/2021; Golf South Clubs, LLC Answer Due 4/23/2021. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/08 5:36 PM
Summons Issued on Randall Miller Answer Due 04/7/2021; Jason Garrison Answer Due 04/7/2021; Christina Matthis Bentley Answer Due 04/7/2021; Michael Keith Bentley Answer Due 04/7/2021; James B. Scott Answer Due 04/7/2021; Terrence Dyer Answer Due 04/7/2021; Steven J. Jencik Answer Due 04/7/2021; Suzanne L. Jencik Answer Due 04/7/2021; Foxcroft Holdings, LLC Answer Due 04/7/2021; Golf South Clubs, LLC Answer Due 04/7/2021 (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/08 5:36 PM
Adversary case 21-00034 5. Complaint by Foxfire Consolidated Owners Association, Inc. against Randall Miller, Jason Garrison, Christina Matthis Bentley, Michael Keith Bentley, James B. Scott, Terrence Dyer, Steven J. Jencik, Suzanne L. Jencik, Foxcroft Holdings, LLC, Golf South Clubs, LLC (Fee Paid) (31 (Approval of sale of property of estate and of a co-owner - 363(h))) (Carmichael, Hope)
Related: [-]