Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-20773

Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dennis R Dow
Case #: 2:21-ap-02003
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
AndPlus, LLC
Sean Mahoney CEO 257 Turnpike Road Ste. 200
Southborough, MA 01772
Represented By
AndPlus, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Primaris Holdings, Inc.
4215 Philips Farm Rd Ste 101a
Columbia, MO 65201
Represented By
Rachel Lynn Foley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/29 11:27 AM
Disposition and Closing Adversary Proceeding Number 2:21-ap-2003. (Smith, Mindy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
14 14 epo Generic Order Thu 09/09 4:08 PM
Order of the Court The Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice filed by Primaris Holdings, Inc. is hereby GRANTED. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Dennis R. Dow. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
13 13 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/08 2:31 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with prejudice filed by Primaris Holdings, Inc.. (Olsen, Jill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
12 12 2 pgs order Order (miscellaneous) Wed 07/21 5:03 PM
Order of the Court Order Approving Debtor's Motion to Compromise Controversy with AndPlus, LLC. Signed on 7/21/2021. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the order category. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
utility Update Adversary Deadlines - public Wed 06/30 8:19 AM
Update Adversary Deadlines -. Response due by 7/20/2021. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
11 11 motion Compromise Controversy Tue 06/29 5:38 PM
Motion to Compromise Controversy with AndPlus, LLC regarding alleged preferential transfers . filed by Primaris Holdings, Inc.. (Olsen, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement
Att: 2 Creditor mailing matrix
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
10 10 audio Audio File - mp3 uploaded Wed 06/16 12:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. CAUTION: PACER FEES APPLY ANYTIME AN AUDIO FILE IS ACCESSED. Court Date & Time [ 6/15/2021 11:15:34 AM ]. File Size [ 1362 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:50 ]. (courtspeak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
9 9 court Hearing Held w/ PO ddl Tue 06/15 11:39 AM
Pretrial Conference Held re: Complaint by Primaris Holdings, Inc. against AndPlus, LLC. The Trial set for 6/24/2021 is hereby Canceled. Parties have reached a settlement. ERO - ja. Proposed Settlement documents due by 6/29/2021. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 29, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/29 2:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by AndPlus, LLC. (Sinclair, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
7 7 epo Extend Time Thu 04/15 1:01 PM
Order of the Court The Motion to Extend Time to file an Answer to the Complaint is hereby GRANTED. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Dennis R. Dow Answer due by 4/30/2021. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
6 6 motion Extend Time Wed 04/14 10:31 AM
Motion to Extend Time Answer Debtor's Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers. Extension requested to April 30, 2021. filed by AndPlus, LLC. (Sinclair, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
5 5 advother Certificate of Service Thu 03/18 2:09 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Primaris Holdings, Inc.. Related [+] (Foley, Rachel)
Related: [-] 4 ,1 ,3
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
4 4 court Summons Issued Wed 03/10 2:58 PM
Summons Issued 3/10/2021 on Defendant(s) AndPlus, LLC . Attorney for Plaintiff to Serve Summons and File a Certificate of Service. NOTE: The Summons is only effective for a period of 7 days after its issuance. Service made after that date is ineffective. Service must be made in accordance with the provisions of Rule 7004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Failure to certify that service was effected within the time and in the manner required may lead to denial of a request for judgment by default. . (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Pretrial Order Wed 03/10 2:57 PM
Pretrial Order. Attorney for Plaintiff is Directed to serve this order and the summons on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law; and, file a Certificate of Service. Please contact Christy Wilkinson at 816-512-1894 or christy_wilkinson@mow.uscourts.gov with any questions, or with a number at which you can be reached on the scheduled Pretrial Telephone Conference date and time. Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 11:00 AM. Participants should call 877-336-1280 and enter Access code 9715711#. Trial date set for 6/24/2021 at 01:30 PM at US Court, 4B, 80 Lafayette St, Jefferson City, MO. Related [+] (Wilkinson, Christy)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Receipt Tue 03/09 2:38 PM
Receipt for Complaint( [LINK 21-02003 drd] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00), with receipt number A17008889, in the amount of 350.00 dollars . Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/09 2:37 PM
Adversary case 21-02003 Complaint by Primaris Holdings, Inc. against AndPlus, LLC. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee of $350.00 today. The Nature of Suit for this Complaint is: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Foley, Rachel)
Related: [-]