Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10549

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:21-bk-10551
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GUIORA, LLC
2140 S DuPont Hwy
Camden, DE 19934-1249
Represented By
Richard Michael Beck
Klehr Harrison Harvey Branzburg LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/08 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/08 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
17 17 notice Receipt of Record - Notice Tue 04/06 3:15 PM
Notice of Receipt of Record from Central District of California. New Bankruptcy Case Numbers 21-12775 Related [+] Filed by (MB)
Related: [-] 14
16 16 utility Corrective Entry Tue 04/06 1:47 PM
Corrective Entry Related [+] (MB)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 notice Receipt of Record - Notice Tue 04/06 1:39 PM
[ENTERED IN ERROR] Notice of Receipt of Record from Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Filed by (MB) Modified on 4/6/2021 (MB)
Related: [-] 14
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 04/06 3:23 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 05, 2021
14 14 order Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer Mon 04/05 3:58 PM
Order Transferring Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 6 ,11
13 13 order Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer Mon 04/05 3:45 PM
Order Transferring Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Signed on 4/5/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 6 ,11
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Mon 04/05 12:25 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by Guiora, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection Mon 04/05 12:13 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion of Debtor and Debtor In Possession Guiora, LLC to Transfer Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Filed by Guiora, LLC. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/30 3:52 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Order Shortening Notice with Respect to Motion of Debtor and Debtor in Possession Guiora, LLC to Transfer Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Filed by Guiora, LLC. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Tue 03/30 3:30 PM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by Guiora, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
8 8 order Shorten Time Fri 03/26 6:26 PM
Order Shortening Notice With Respect to Motion of Debtor and Debtor in Possession Guiora, LLC to Transfer Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Related [+] Signed on 3/26/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Shorten - Motion Fri 03/26 3:39 PM
Motion to Shorten Motion of the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Guiora, LLC, to Shorten Notice Period Pursuant to Rule 9006(c)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 9006-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure for the Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1412 Related [+] Filed by Guiora, LLC. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-] 6
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order
6 6 motion Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer - Motion Fri 03/26 3:01 PM
Motion to Change Venue/Inter-district Transfer Motion of Debtor and Debtor In Possession Guiora, LLC to Transfer Venue to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Central District of California Filed by Guiora, LLC. Objections due by 4/5/2021. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
5 5 court Minute Entry Thu 03/25 4:06 PM
MINUTE ENTRY Re: Related [+] APPEARANCES: See attached sign-in sheet MATTERS: 1) Status conference held. Motion to transfer venue to be filed. (lmc)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 3/24/21
Monday, March 22, 2021
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing - Notice Mon 03/22 10:46 AM
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Telephonic Hearing Filed by Guiora, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
3 3 notice Hearing - Notice Thu 03/18 3:13 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Status Conference Filed by Guiora, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
misc Add Attorney Fri 03/12 4:29 PM
Attorney Rosa Sierra and Rosa Sierra for U.S. Trustee added to case Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Sierra, Rosa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
court Case Assigned Thu 03/11 7:41 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 03/10 6:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 21-10551 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A10229889, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 03/10 6:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by GUIORA, LLC. (Beck, Richard)
Related: [-]