Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00005
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Apr 01, 2023 5:50 PM EDT
Defendant
Katia U Young (15)
Represented By
Mike Whalen
Law Office Of Mike Whalen
contact info
Defendant
Stephen R. Jordan (1)
Represented By
Robert R Kurtz
Stanley, Kurtz & Collins, PLLC
contact info
Henry M Scharg
Law Offices Of Henry M. Scharg
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alan Scott Kirk
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info
Jeremy Stephen Dykes
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info
Brent Nelson Jones
U S Department Of Justice (knox Usao)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Stephanie R Roulette (10)
Terminated: 11/07/2022
Represented By
Kimberly A Parton
Law Office Of Kimberly A Parton
contact info
Defendant
Lamar A Wheeler (14)
Terminated: 02/22/2023
Represented By
Scott L Saidak
Bridgefront Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexander C Steidl (7)
Terminated: 01/20/2023
Represented By
Randall E. Reagan
Law Office Of Randall Reagan
contact info
Defendant
Ray E Sayne (19)
Terminated: 08/15/2022
Represented By
Michael Thomas Cabage
Law Office Of Michael T. Cabage
contact info
Defendant
Diontay D Martin (16)
Terminated: 11/30/2022
Represented By
Wesley D Stone
Stone Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Dellone M Martin (17)
Terminated: 03/07/2023
Represented By
Scott Allan Lanzon
Hindman & Associates
contact info
Scott Alan Lanzon
Hindman And Lanzon
contact info
Defendant
Jamar B Major (13)
Terminated: 02/01/2023
Represented By
Christopher Rodgers
Law Office Of Kit Rodgers
contact info
Defendant
Latisha R Galyon (20)
Terminated: 01/20/2023
Represented By
Jonathan S Wood
Jonathan S. Wood, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Frederick G Davis, Jr. (18)
Terminated: 11/10/2022
Represented By
R. Deno Cole
Mcgehee, Cole, Guindi & Walling, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Meghan M Williams (8)
Terminated: 08/22/2022
Represented By
Mark E Brown
Menefee & Brown, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Milan D. Claypool (2)
Terminated: 01/05/2023
Represented By
Steven Scharg
Steven Scharg
contact info
Defendant
Lennox L Roper, Jr (3)
Terminated: 02/13/2023
Represented By
Rachel L Wolf
Law Office Of Rachel Wolf
contact info
John Stanford Young, III
Bell, Young & Moore, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Travis A Roberts (9)
Terminated: 11/18/2022
Represented By
Forrest L Wallace
Law Offices Of Gary Dawson
contact info
Defendant
William E Powell (6)
Terminated: 08/15/2022
Represented By
Jamie Poston Hughes
Law Office Of Jamie Poston
contact info
Defendant
Jada J McNair (5)
Terminated: 08/09/2022
Represented By
Donny M Young
Donny M Young, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Cameron Kitzmiller (11)
Terminated: 08/25/2022
Represented By
Joshua D Hedrick
Whitt, Cooper, Hedrick & Wojcik
contact info
Defendant
Victoria C Jeffers (12)
Terminated: 12/06/2021
Represented By
Christopher J Oldham
Christopher J. Oldham
contact info
Defendant
Erica L. Edwards (4)
Terminated: 04/06/2022
Represented By
Ruth Thompson Ellis
Ellis Law Firm Pllc (knoxville)
contact info

GPO Feb 22 2022
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Diontay D Martin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on February 22, 2022. (Attachments: # (1) Other Part II) (RLK)
GPO Aug 07 2024
ORDER denying pro se 795 Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release as to Meghan M Williams (8). Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on August 7, 2024. (JAN)(copy mailed to dft at address provided on motion)
GPO Aug 20 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Dellone M Martin signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/20/2024. [Copy mailed to D. Martin] (JDH)
GPO Aug 22 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 743 MOTION for Production of Sentencing Transcripts as to Dellone M Martin (17); 737 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis for Request of Documents as to Dellone M Martin (17). Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/22/2024. [Copy mailed to D. Martin] (JDH)
GPO Jan 15 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to Frederick G Davis, Jr. DENYING Pro se 804 MOTION to Reduce Sentence filed by Frederick G Davis, Jr. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on January 15, 2025. (JAN)(copy mailed to dft)

Docket last updated: 04/06/2023 7:19 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
5 5 1 pgs MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Stephen R. Jordan and Milan D. Claypool. (ADA)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO SEAL granting 5 Motion to Seal Case as to Stephen R. Jordan (1) and Milan D. Claypool (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia R. Wyrick on 2/9/21. (ADA)
Related: [-]
7 7 INDICTMENT as to Stephen R. Jordan (1) count(s) 1 and Milan D. Claypool (2) count(s) 1.(ADA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet Jordan,
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet Claypool
8 8 Sealed Unredacted Indictment. (ADA)
Related: [-]