California Southern District Court
Judge:William Q Hayes
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:21-cv-00420
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2021
Defendant
CDCR Medical Contracting
Defendant
Dr. Massoud Soumekh
Defendant
J. Silva
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
Defendant
Reddy
Defendant
Shpaner
Defendant
Synthes
Defendant
Weeks
Plaintiff
Kevin Voage

GPO Sep 22 2021
Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/22/21. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
GPO Nov 19 2021
ORDER Denying Defendants' Motions To Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(6) [ECF10,11]. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/19/2021.* Pro Bono Panel received notification (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dxf)
GPO Mar 28 2025
Order Granting Joint Motion To Continue Settlement Disposition Conference [ECF No. 118]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 03/28/2025. (stn)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
120 120 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Bifurcate Order on Motion to Exclude Tue 04/01 2:50 PM
ORDER denying108 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying109 Motion to Bifurcate; denying110 Motion to Exclude; denying111 Motion to Exclude. Signed by District Judge William Q. Hayes on 04/01/2025. (stn) (anh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
119 119 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 03/28 3:28 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion To Continue Settlement Disposition Conference [ECF No.118 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 03/28/2025. (stn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
118 118 motion Continue Thu 03/27 8:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Settlement Disposition Conference by Kevin Voage. (Hutchison, Kimberly)
Related: [-]