Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Beth Phillips
Case #: 4:21-mc-09011
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:651 Occupational Safety/Health
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2021
Terminated:Nov 15, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, November 15, 2021
29 29 order Clerk's Order of Dismissal Mon 11/15 10:39 AM
Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 11/15 8:19 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by U.S. Department of Labor (Hague, Dana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
27 27 service Return of service (non cmp) Tue 08/31 1:26 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE (non cmp) re21 Order to Show Cause. Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Tim Bowman, served on 8/17/2021. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 23, 2021
26 26 misc Mail Returned Mon 08/23 3:38 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Compass Resources, c/o Tim Bowman, 14725S. Alden, Olathe, KS 66062, cert mail receipt 7019 1120 0000 1689 5994, not delivered. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 21
25 25 misc Mail Returned Mon 08/23 3:34 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Compass Resources, c/o Tim Bowman, 14725 S. Alden, Olathe, KS 66062. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, August 17, 2021
24 24 misc Green card (return) Tue 08/17 3:29 PM
GREEN CARD showing return of service to Compass Resources c/o Tim Bowman, 525 West 115th Place, Apt 32, Leawood, KS 66211 re21 Order to Show Cause, served on 8/13/21. USPS website tracking indicates "Your item was delivered to the front desk, reception area, or mail room at 3:19 pm on August 13, 2021 in LEAWOOD, KS 66211." Cert mail receipt 7019 1120 0000 1689 6007. Related document(s)21 ) (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 12, 2021
23 23 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/12 10:46 AM
E-MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. The e-mail sent to Tim Bowman at tbowman@hthus.com (with attachment, Doc.21 Order to Show Cause; sent on 8/11/21 at 10:29 a.m.) was returned undeliverable on 8/12/21 at 10:33 a.m. The Court has resent this email with the attachment, Doc. 21, to a corrected email address of tbowman@h2hus.com on 8/12/21 at 10:42 a.m. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
22 22 utility Remark Wed 08/11 11:07 AM
***Remark: Certified copies of Order (Doc. 21) and USM-285 forms were hand-delivered to US Marshal's Office on 8/11/2021. (Melvin, Greg)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/11 10:23 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CIVIL CONTEMPT OF COURT. A hearing on the Department of Labor's Motion for a Finding of Civil Contempt will be held at 10:00 AM on November 16, 2021, in Courtroom 7A in the United States Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri. Tim Bowman is ORDERED to attend this hearing in person. Signed on 8/11/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular and certified mail on 8/11/21 to: 1) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Tim Bowman, 14725 S. Alden, Olathe, KS 66062 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5994); 2) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Tim Bowman, 525 West 115th Place, Apt. 32, Leawood, KS 66211 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 6007) and 3) via email to tbowman@hthus.com. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
20 20 motion Enforce Order/Judgment Wed 07/28 2:29 PM
MOTION to enforce order/judgment Motion for Finding of Civil Contempt filed by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/11/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Hague, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Suggestions in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Monday, June 28, 2021
19 19 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/28 3:06 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Tim Bowman, Managing Member, Compass Resources, returned undeliverable. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, June 25, 2021
18 18 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/25 10:45 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Compass Resources. c/o Tim Bowman. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
17 17 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/25 10:42 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez/Compass Resources, Related [+] returned. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
16 16 misc Green card (return) Fri 06/25 10:32 AM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re10 Compass Resources c/o Tim Bowman, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Green card has no signature or date. USPS tracking information attached to document. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, June 21, 2021
15 15 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/21 4:57 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez/Compass Resources Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
14 14 misc Mail Returned Mon 06/21 4:56 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez/Compass Resources Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 8
13 13 misc Green card (return) Mon 06/21 4:51 PM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,Compass Resources, c/o Tim Bowman served on 6/15/21. Cert mail receipt ending 5956. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
12 12 misc Green card (return) Tue 06/15 10:30 AM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief: Compass Resources, c/o Spencer Fane served on 6/10/21. Green card is unsigned but upon confirmation at usps.com, the certified mail was delivered on 6/10/21 at 12:17 pm to an individual at the company and address listed on the certified mailing. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, June 14, 2021
11 11 misc Green card (return) Mon 06/14 9:59 AM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,Spenserv Inc. served on 6/9/21. Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, June 07, 2021
10 10 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 06/07 12:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION (Doc.1 ) TO ENFORCE ADMINISTRATIVE SUBPOENA DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS IN RESPONSE TO THE DOL/OSHA SUBPOENA DATED 12/22/2020. It is ORDERED that Respondent Compass Resources, L.L.C., shall comply with the subpoena duces tecum issued by the Kansas City Area Office of the Occupational Safety and Health Administration, United States Department of Labor, dated December 22, 2020. See Order for details. Signed on 6/7/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular and certified US Mail on 6/7/21 to: 1) Robin S. Martinez, Registered Agent, Compass Resources, LLC 1150 Grand Blvd., Ste. 240, Kansas City, MO 64106 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5901); 2) Tim Bowman, Managing Member, Compass Resources LLC, 6608 W. 220nd Terrace, Bucyrus, KS 66013 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5918); 3) Spenserv, Inc., Registered Agent, Compass Resources, LLC, 6201 College Blvd., Ste. 500, Overland Park, KS 66211 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5925); 4) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Tim Bowman, 14725 S. Alden, Olathe, KS 66062 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5932), 5) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Spencer Fane LLP, Attn: Chelsea Fury, 2144 E. Republic Rd., Ste. B300, Springfield, MO 65804, (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5949) and 6) Compass Resources, L.L.C., c/o Tim Bowman, 525 West 115th Place, Apt. 32, Leawood, KS 66211 (cert mail receipt no. 7019 1120 0000 1689 5956). (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
9 9 minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 06/03 11:10 AM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 6/3/2021. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Dana Marie Hague. Time in court: 10:03 a.m. to 10:09 a.m.. Plaintiff present and ready for hearing. Defendant did not appear. Show Cause Hearing on Motion to Enforce Subpoena. The Court finds Defendant has received proper notice. Plaintiff will submit a proposed order for defendant to comply for the court's consideration. Court adjourned 10:09 a.m..To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Katie Wirt, 816-512-5608, katie_wirt@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIlvain, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 21, 2021
8 8 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/21 11:10 AM
ORDER. The June 3, 2021 show cause hearing will remain set. Signed on 5/21/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 5/21/21 to: 1) Robin S. Martinez, Registered Agent, Compass Resources, LLC 1150 Grand Blvd., Ste. 240, Kansas City, MO 64106; 2) Tim Bowman, Managing Member, Compass Resources LLC, 6608 W. 220nd Terrace, Bucyrus, KS 66013; 3) Spenserv, Inc., Registered Agent, Compass Resources, LLC, 6201 College Blvd., Ste. 500, Overland Park, KS 66211; 4) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Tim Bowman, 14725 S. Alden, Olathe, KS 66062, and 5) Compass Resources, LLC, c/o Spencer Fane LLP, Attn: Chelsea Fury, 2144 E. Republic Rd., Ste. B300, Springfield, MO 65804.(Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 05/18 9:34 AM
STATUS REPORT by U.S. Department of Labor.(Hague, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Monday, May 10, 2021
6 6 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/10 4:06 PM
ORDER. The Court is not convinced that Compass Resources received the Order to Show Cause, or that there is any reason to keep the June 3 hearing on the schedule. Court directs the DOL to address (within ten days) whether the hearing should be postponed or whether other means of notice should be employed. Signed on 5/10/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
5 5 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/31 3:50 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez, Compass Resources, LLC, returned "unable to forward." Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 misc Mail Returned Wed 03/31 3:49 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Robin Martinez, Compass Resources, LLC, returned "unable to forward." Related [+] (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
3 3 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 03/17 2:40 PM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE DIRECTED TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS. It ORDERED that Respondents shall serve upon Petitioner's counsel a written response to the Petition to Enforce Subpoena and Supporting Suggestions, specifically admitting or denying each allegation, and setting forth the cause, if any there be, why the Petition should not be granted, by April 30, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents named herein appear in Courtroom 7A in the United States Courthouse in Kansas City, Missouri, at 10:00 a.m. on June 3, 2021, for a show cause hearing. Signed on 3/17/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed via regular and certified US Mail on 3/17/21 to: 1)Robin Martinez, Registered Agent, Compass Resources LLC, 1150 Grand Blvd., Ste. 240, Kansas City, MO 64106 (cert mail receipt no. 7016 3560 0000 4920 1534) and 2) Tim Bowman, Managing Member, Compass Resources LLC, 6608 W. 200 Terrace, Bucyrus, KS 66013 (cert mail receipt no. 7016 3560 0000 4920 1541). (Cordell, Annette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
2 2 respm Suggestions in Support of Motion Thu 03/11 10:09 AM
SUGGESTIONS in support re1 MOTION for order Enforce Administrative Subpoena filed by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Department of Labor. Related [+] (Hague, Dana)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Annastasia Tolley,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena Duces Tecum Compass,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Return of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - 1-6-21 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - 1-7-21 Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - 1-11-21 Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 1-19-21 Email
1 1 2 pgs motion Order Thu 03/11 9:58 AM
MOTION for order Enforce Administrative Subpoena filed by Dana Marie Hague on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Hague, Dana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet