California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:21-cv-01721
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 11, 2021
Terminated:Jun 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 07, 2021 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Molly C. Dwyer
Represented By
Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Susan Y Soong
Represented By
Jevechius Doherty Bernardoni
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
The Lynmoore at Lawnwood Assisted Living and Memory Care
Plaintiff
Deborah Cooney
P 0 Box 700013
Wabasso, FL 32970

GPO Oct 12 2021
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS DWYER & SOONG; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting with prejudice 25 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Molly C. Dwyer and Susan Y. Soong. Court VACATES the motion hearing set for 10/26/2021. The Case Management Conference is VACATED until further notice. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
GPO Nov 09 2021
ORDER FINDING MOTION TO DISMISS MOOT AND VACATING MOTION HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; finding as moot 36 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The hearing set December 14, 2021 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
GPO Jun 06 2022
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, March 29, 2024
335 335 appeal USCA Order Fri 03/29 2:59 PM
ORDER of USCA as to329 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Deborah Cooney (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]