Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark L Wolf
Referred: Jennifer C Boal
Case #: 1:21-cv-10430
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2021
Terminated:Aug 02, 2021
Case in other court:Middlesex Superior Court, 20-03111
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 08, 2021 5:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Radius Health, Inc.
Represented By
Deepa K. Desai
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Matthew A. Porter
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Fisher Phillips
contact info
Mediator
Edward F. Harrington
Plaintiff
Jean E. Personnat
Represented By
Marc J. Levy
Marc J. Levy, Esquire LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, August 02, 2021
22 22 order Settlement Order of Dismissal Mon 08/02 5:57 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Loret, Magdalena)
Related: [-]
21 21 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Mon 08/02 3:42 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. This case has SETTLED. A Settlement Order may issue.(McLaughlin, Tracy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/26 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deepa K. Desai on behalf of Radius Health, Inc. (Desai, Deepa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 20, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of ADR Conference Tue 07/20 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 8/2/2021 10:00AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Senior Judge Edward F. Harrington. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. You may forward the invitation to your clients for participation in the Mediation. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Counsel and principals are ORDERED to be present and to have full settlement authority. A brief mediation memorandum addressing both the merits of the case and the filing party's settlement position should be submitted to the court via email as an attachment to tracy_mclaughlin@mad.uscourts.gov by 7/27/2021 at 12:00PM. The mediation memo should be marked "Confidential - Not for docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing parties. Counsel are asked to accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time or the date poses a serious conflict, please contact Tracy McLaughlin at the email address above. (McLaughlin, Tracy)
Related: [-]
16 16 utility Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider Tue 07/20 6:54 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Edward F. Harrington appointed.(Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 24, 2021
15 15 order Order Referring Case to ADR Thu 06/24 12:45 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution (Mediation). (Loret, Magdalena)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/24 12:29 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Joint Motion to Refer Case to Mediation by Radius Health, Inc. (Loret, Magdalena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 23, 2021
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/23 4:21 PM
Joint MOTION Refer Case to Mediation by Radius Health, Inc..(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
12 12 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Thu 04/22 12:43 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Radius Health, Inc..(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
11 11 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/21 5:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: A Status Conference is set for January 5, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A Status Report is due by January 3, 2022. (York, Steve)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 04/21 5:14 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Scheduling Conference held on 4/21/2021. This hearing was held by video. The Court reviewed the scheduling plan with the parties and inquired as to their desire for a mediation hearing. A Scheduling order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Levy for the plaintiff; Pinarchick for the defendant;) (York, Steve)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
9 9 misc Joint statement re scheduling conference Tue 04/13 12:36 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference .(Levy, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Tue 03/23 11:15 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.The initial Scheduling Conference is set for April 21, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. by Remote Proceeding at Boston before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (York, Steve)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
7 7 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/22 6:40 PM
Judge Mark L. Wolf: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Referred for: Full Pretrial, Dispositive Motions (ptd), Report and Recommendations. (Loret, Magdalena)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/19 12:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Radius Health, Inc..(Pinarchick, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Mon 03/15 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Matthew A. Porter (Porter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/15 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl B. Pinarchick on behalf of Radius Health, Inc. (Pinarchick, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
3 3 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Fri 03/12 1:40 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Baker, Casey)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Fri 03/12 1:01 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/12 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Radius Health, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8677233 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Porter, Matthew) (Exhibits removed from Main Document 1 and is was replaced; Removed the Category Sheet from Attachment 1 and it was replaced on 3/12/2021) (Baker, Casey). (Baker, Casey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form
Att: 3 (3/12/2021) Exhibit