Thomas v. Amazon.com, Inc
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01325 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 08, 2021 4:49 AM EDT |
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Verniece Carmona
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Romelo Rivera
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 12 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 4/11/2022 granting Amazon's 16 Motion to Dismiss. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/11/2022 ) *Forwarded for judgment. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 13, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 04/13 4:41 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 4/13/2022 that Amazon's motion to dismiss is granted. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court on 4/13/2022 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, April 12, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
10
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 04/12 11:23 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 4/11/2022 granting Amazon's16 Motion to Dismiss. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/11/2022 ) *Forwarded for judgment. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Tue 09/21 2:26 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/21/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/21 1:41 PM
STIPULATION / Stipulated Protective Order [PROPOSED] by Amazon.com, Inc (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Monday, June 28, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Reply in Support
Mon 06/28 8:28 PM
REPLY in Support re16 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/17 5:57 PM
DECLARATION re21 Memorandum in Opposition by Verniece Carmona, Romelo Rivera, Michael Thomas (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
21 | 21
22
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 06/17 5:36 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re16 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss ,17 Memorandum in Support filed by Verniece Carmona, Romelo Rivera, Michael Thomas. (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Transcript
Wed 06/02 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5-13-21, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber M.Nardone, Telephone number 718-613-2601. Email address: mishrpr@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 6/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2021. (Nardone, Michele) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/01 4:31 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Verniece Carmona, Romelo Rivera, Michael Thomas. (D'Auria, Alfons) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/01 5:41 PM
ORDER granting19 . Plaintiff's opposition to motion to dismiss due by 6/17/2021; defendant's reply due by 6/28/2021. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/1/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Thu 05/27 8:47 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re16 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss --Declaration of Gabrielle Levin filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Job Description, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- OSHA 3220-10N, Warehousing, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Comment from the Greater New York Hospital Association, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D- OSHA 3170-O2R, Safeguarding Equipment and Protecting Employees From Amputations | ||
17 | 17
17
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Thu 05/27 8:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/27 8:32 PM
Notice of MOTION to Dismiss by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Thu 05/13 3:14 PM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 05/13/2021. Both sides present by videoconference. Defendant to file motion to dismiss by 05/27/2021; plaintiffs to oppose by 06/10/2021; reply by 06/17/2021. Parties are to proceed with discovery as to how the Sortation Associate position is performed at the facility at issue. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Michele Nardone). (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Tue 05/11 1:31 PM
Letter re Stay discovery and Case Management Plan by Verniece Carmona, Romelo Rivera, Michael Thomas (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Tue 05/11 3:50 PM
ORDER: The parties of record are directed to use the video link provide by email to participate in the initial conference scheduled on May 13, 2021 at 12:00 PM. All others may dial the toll free number posted on the docket to listen to the proceeding. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/11/2021. (Clarke, Melonie) |
||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 05/11 4:54 PM
ORDER re:15 . The parties need not submit a case management plan, but they should be aware that, subject to the discussion at the conference, the Court is disinclined to stay discovery. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/11/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Thu 05/06 3:01 PM
Letter - Joint Letter regarding Initial Status Conference by Amazon.com, Inc (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 04/22 4:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 04/22 5:37 PM
ORDER granting13 . Defendant's time to answer extended to 5/20/21. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/22/2021. (Clarke, Melonie) |
||
Tuesday, April 20, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/20 4:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc, filed by Michael Thomas, Romelo Rivera, Verniece Carmona. (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 04/09 4:40 PM
ORDER granting in part11 . Defendant's time to answer is extended to 5/20/2021. However, this Court does not wait for answers to be filed as they are not required in planning discovery set at the conference, therefore the Initial Status Conference is adjourned only to 5/13/2021 at 12:00 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 1325#. The adjournment granted by this Order should allow defendant enough time to investigate and prepare its portion of the joint summary letter The parties are reminded to file on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/9/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer Adjourn Conference
Thu 04/08 4:23 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint , Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Amazon.com, Inc. (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/08 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriell Frances Levin on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc (aty to be noticed) (Levin, Gabriell) |
|
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/16 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alfons D'Auria on behalf of Michael Thomas (aty to be noticed) (D'Auria, Alfons) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/16 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Howard Lowe on behalf of Michael Thomas (aty to be noticed) (Lowe, Christopher) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 03/12 7:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 4/22/2021 at 10:00 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 1325#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements, including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/12/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/12 11:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 03/12 11:54 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/12 11:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/12 11:27 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint by Michael Thomas (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/12 11:26 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint by Michael Thomas (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/12 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against Amazon.com, Inc filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14272595 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Michael Thomas. (Lipsky, Douglas) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/12 11:50 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |