Washington Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Frederick P Corbit
Case #: 2:04-bk-00757
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2004
Creditor Meeting:Mar 15, 2004
Claims Deadline:Jun 14, 2004
Plan Confirmed:Feb 13, 2006

Debtor
METROPOLITAN MORTGAGE & SECURITIES CO
3731 N Ramsey Road Suite 110B
Coeur d' Alene, ID 83815
Represented By
Bruce W Leaverton
Lane Powell
contact info
Julia A Bahner
Lane Powell Spears Lubersky
contact info
Michael Diehl
Michael Diehl, Attorney At Law
contact info
David E. Eash
Ewing Anderson, P.S.
contact info
Mary Ellen Gaffney-Brown
Lineberger & Gaffney-Brown
contact info
Barry W Davidson
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Lea Hong
Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing
contact info
Jonathan M Shaw
Susman Godfrey
contact info
Susan Anne Brye
Washington Mutual Bank
contact info
Steven G Jones
Marten Law Group PLLC
contact info
Bruce K Medeiros
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Tina L Colman
Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing
contact info
Barry W Davidson^
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Stephen F Backman
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Grant E Courtney
Lane Powell Spears Lubersky LLP
contact info
John P Giesa
Reed & Giesa
contact info
Christopher J Wright
Christopher J Wright PLLC
contact info
Charles R Ekberg
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Mary Jo Heston
Lane Powell LP
contact info
H Lee Godfrey
Susman Godfrey
contact info
Timothy J Giesa
Reed & Giesa Ps
contact info
Bruce A Anderson
Elsaesser Jarzabek Anderson Elliott
contact info
Debtor
SUMMIT SECURITIES INC
12810 E Nora Ave Suite D
Spokane Valley, WA 99216
Represented By
John Joseph Jolley, Jr
Fidelity National Title Insurance Co.
contact info
Barry W Davidson^
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jun 27, 2014 9:27 AM PDT
Accountant
Joe Dawson
Dawson & Gerbic, LLP Tax Consultants and Accountants for the 2208 NW Market St., #405
Seattle, WA 98107
Represented By
Susan Anne Brye
Washington Mutual Bank
contact info
Attorney
John W Campbell
Esposito George & Campbell 421 W Riverside Suite 960
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
John W Campbell
Law Offices Of John W Campbell
contact info
Attorney
JOSEPH A ESPOSITO
W 421 RIVERSIDE #960
SPOKANE, WA 99201
Represented By
Joseph A Esposito^
Esposito George & Campbell
contact info
Attorney
Charles R Ekberg
1420 Fifth Ave #4100
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Charles R Ekberg
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Attorney
Christopher G Emch
Foster et al 1111 Third Avenue #3400
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Attorney
Ewing Anderson, PS
Represented By
David E. Eash
Ewing Anderson, P.S.
contact info
Attorney
Bob Faucher
Holland & Hart 101 S Capitol Blvd #1400
Boise, ID 83701
Attorney
Peter J Grabicki
1500 Seafirst Bldg.
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Anthony E Grabicki
Randall & Danskin
contact info
Attorney
Andrew A Guy
600 University St. #3600
Seattle, WA 98101
Attorney
Kutak Rock LLP
Represented By
John Joseph Jolley, Jr
Fidelity National Title Insurance Co.
contact info
Attorney
Lane Powell Spears Lubersky, LLP
Represented By
Charles R Ekberg
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Attorney
Matt Parvalho
Ernst & Young 701 W 5th Avenue
Seattle, WA 98101
Attorney
Andrew Schillinger
Layman Loft et al 818 W Riverside #820
Soijane, WA 99201
Attorney
Sorling, Northrup, Hanna, Cullen, & Cochran
Consultant
HUNTER STEVENS LLC
Creditor
Saylor Group
Represented By
John D Munding
Crumb And Munding
contact info
F Mike Shaffer
Gordon Thomas Honeywell Et Al LLP
contact info
Creditor
ABM Janitorial Services
ABM Industries Inc. 8101 West Sam Houston Pkwy Sutie 150
Houston, TX 77072
Represented By
Michael S DeLeo
Peterson Russell Kelly PLLC
contact info
Creditor
ALEXANDRA ANDRONIKOS
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
NIKOS ANDRONIKOS
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
APPRAISAL SERVICES INC.
%PO BOX 1225
DEER PARK, WA 99006
Represented By
Dale L Russell
Russell Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Dan Adams
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Gordon Adams
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Suzanne Adams
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Carole J Adams-Alexander
Creditor
Mary Albright
Represented By
Larry W Fagerness
contact info
Creditor
Ronald W Alexander
Creditor
Alvarez & Marsal LLC
600 Lexington Ave 6th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Creditor
Gerald Anderson
P O Box 100
Cle Elum, WA 98922
Creditor
John & Joyce Anderson
1304 N Bannen Rd
Spokane Valley, WA 99216
Creditor
Victor E Anderson
Represented By
Bernard W McNallen
Balsam Mcnallen
contact info
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 W. 37th Street 9th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Matthew A Gold
Argo Partners
contact info
Creditor
Wilfred Arsenault
818 W. Riverside, Ste. 631
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
John F Bury
Murphy Bantz Bury PLLC
contact info
Creditor
ANTONIA M BAKER
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
BANK OF NEW YORK
Represented By
Gregg D Johnson
Ater Wynne LLP
contact info
Creditor
BNY Western Trust Company
Represented By
Gregg D Johnson
Ater Wynne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Mary Bader
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Creditor
Eloise W Bailey
1850 Narragansett Court
San Diego, CA 92107
Creditor
Jackie Barcus
Creditor
Andrew Belew
Represented By
Daniel R Tiffany
Lombino Martino Ps
contact info
John F Bury
Murphy Bantz Bury PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Heather Bell
2028 E Avendale Lane
Hayden Lake, ID 83835
Creditor
Katie O Berg
183 DeGrief Road
Colville, WA 99114
Creditor
Vaun Bingham
Represented By
Chad A Campos
Beard St Clair Gaffney Mcnamara Calder
contact info
Creditor
Shirley M Booher
Represented By
Craig W Christensen
contact info
Creditor
Myrna Brossard
Represented By
Darrell W Scott
The Scott Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Ross E. Bruner
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Hilda A Bruning
Represented By
Wesley A Nuxoll
contact info
Creditor
Mary CASTREY
Creditor
COWLES PUBLISHING COMPANY
Represented By
Duane M Swinton
Witherspoon Kelley Davenport & Toole Ps
contact info
Christopher G Varallo
Witherspoon Kelley
contact info
Creditor
Maryette Y Camp
Represented By
DAN F HULTGRENN
Kuffel Hultgrenn Klashke & She
contact info
Creditor
Maralyn D Carey
6463 Lower Waitsburg Road
Walla Walla, WA 99362
Represented By
James K Hayner
Minnick-Hayner
contact info
Creditor
Cascade Recovery, Inc.,
James P. Laurick 732 NW 19th Avenue
Portland, OR 97209
Represented By
James P Laurick
Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick
contact info
Creditor
Cauvel Creditors (Saylor Group)
Represented By
John D Munding
Crumb And Munding
contact info
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Bradford Aston Cederblom
15568 Windsong Lane
Rathdrum, ID 83858
Creditor
Ralph Phillip Chiariello
915 West St
Oceanside, CA 92054
Creditor
James Christiansen
Creditor
Citicorp Vendor Finance Inc.
Represented By
John J Mitchell
Law Office Of John J Mitchell
contact info
Creditor
Anthony Clarke
SOEST 1000 Pope Rd
Honolulu, HI 96822
Creditor
James Colson
Represented By
Linda E Fisher
Seton Hall U School Of Law
contact info
ALAN L MCNEIL
University Legal Assistance
contact info
Creditor
Continental Casualty Company
Represented By
Andrew J Flame
Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Barry L McCoy
Drinker Biddle & Reath
contact info
Steven M Cronin
Mullin Cronin Casey & Blair
contact info
Creditor
County of Bastrop
Represented By
Michael Reed
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
County of Henderson
Represented By
Michael Reed
Mccreary Veselka Bragg & Allen PC
contact info
Creditor
Gary Crithfield
c/o 1000 SW Broadway, Ste. 1400
Portland, OR 97205
Represented By
Jeffrey C Misley
Sussman Shank
contact info
Creditor
Richard Davenport
Represented By
Elizabeth A Trainor
contact info
Creditor
Dillingham Ranch Management LLC
Represented By
Kenneth M Nakasone
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Creditor
Alan L Doubravsky
PO BOX 961
GOLDENDALE, WA 98620
Represented By
Edward B Shamek
Shamek Law Office
contact info
Creditor
Kimball Doxey
Represented By
Mark W Pugsley
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Creditor
Jennifer Dunlap
Represented By
Darrell W Scott
The Scott Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Ellington, Weed, Masters, MacGeagh & Reid
Represented By
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
J M Enders
27431 Via Olmo
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
Creditor
Elizabeth Epperson
34 Woodvue Road
Windham, NH 03087
Represented By
Patricia L Brown
contact info
Creditor
David D Erickson
6109 NE 188th Place
Kenmore, WA 98028
Creditor
L V FREEL
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
Tom Felts
Represented By
Kari Marie Campos
Beard St. Clair Gaffney Mcnamara Caldera
contact info
Creditor
Marjorie Forsgren
1504 E 58th Ave
Spokane, WA 99210
Creditor
Mary Ann Franske
14315 N E Alton Ct
Portland, OR 97230
Creditor
Marilyn Freel
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
Fulcrum Tower I, LP
Represented By
Matthew W Hamilton
Fulcrum Credit Partners LLC
contact info
Creditor
M. Kathryn Gamer
McGavick Graves, P.S. 1102 Broadway, Ste. 500
Tacoma, WA 98402
Represented By
Gregory F Amann
Mcgavick Graves Ps
contact info
Creditor
Kennard A Gerl
15735 SE 167th Place
Renton, WA 98058
Creditor
James & Sabrina Goodsen
208 Lakeview Drive
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Creditor
Robert & Lillian Gottler
301 N 1st Street #814
Coeur d'Alene, ID 83814
Creditor
Coleman M Greer
Creditor
Grier
Creditor
Walter Hartman
29 North 6th St.
Cheney, WA 99004
Creditor
Hawaii Forest Preservation LLC
Attn Michael D. Currin 422 W Riverside Suite 1100
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Shelley N Ripley
Witherspoon Kelley Davenport & Toole Ps
contact info
Creditor
Hearing Care Centers SW Washington Inc
Represented By
Richard A Paroutaud
Mano, Mckerricher & Paroutaud Inc
contact info
Creditor
Robin Helms
125 Natoma Way Unit A
Oceanside, CA 92057
Represented By
Craig R Bockman
contact info
Creditor
Roy & Linda Henson
717 W Sprague Ave Suite 1600
Spokane, WA 99201
Creditor
Robert Hewitt
119 -20th St
San Diego, CA 92102
Creditor
Investors Financial Limited Partnership
Represented By
Dale G Higer
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
PETER L. SLINN
Stoel Rives, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Priscilla R Iverson
Represented By
Bernard W McNallen
Balsam Mcnallen
contact info
Creditor
Jaguar Credit
1427 West Sixth Avenue
Spokane, WA 99204
Represented By
Richard J Hayden^
Richard J Hayden P.S.
contact info
Richard J Hayden
Richard J Hayden P S
contact info
Creditor
Frederic Jennings
1200 - 112th Ave NE Ste C-110
Bellevue, WA 98004
Represented By
James P Davis
James P Davis PLLC
contact info
Creditor
John Hancock Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Whitney J Baran
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Thomas T Bassett
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Creditor
Patricia L Johnson
Creditor
R Johnson
Represented By
John F Bury
Murphy Bantz Bury PLLC
contact info
Creditor
John & Freedia Kay
3830 Carnegie Dr
Oceanside, CA 92056
Creditor
Kingfisher Land Holdings
Represented By
Jed W Morris
Lukins & Annis, Ps
contact info
Thomas T Bassett
K&l Gates LLP
contact info
Creditor
Betty Ann Kjilland
3820 Spadomi Lane
Gig Harbor, WA 98335
Creditor
Klamath Basin Improvement District
Represented By
Justin e Throne
contact info
Creditor
Dennis & Gloria Lekander
1714 E 36th Ave
Spokane, WA 99203
Represented By
Bernard W McNallen
Balsam Mcnallen
contact info
Creditor
A M Limborg
10322 15th Avenue NE
Seattle, WA 98125
Creditor
Los Angeles Treasurer and Tax Collector
PO Box 54110
Los Angeles, CA 90054
Creditor
CYNTHIA MACGEAGH
Dunn&Black, P.S. 10 N. Post, Ste. 200
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER c/o BARBARA LEE CALDWELL HEBERT SCHENK P.C. 4742 N. 24TH STREET, SUITE 100
PHOENIX, AZ 85016
Represented By
Barbara Lee Caldwell
Hebert Schenk PC
contact info
Creditor
THOMAS MASTERS
Represented By
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Mark E Vovos
Mark E Vovos Ps
contact info
Creditor
Paula Mackey
500 Union St. Ste. 500
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Larry B Feinstein
Vortman & Feinstein
contact info
Creditor
Malani Inc
Represented By
Kenneth M Nakasone
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Creditor
Mansfield Cemertery Association
P.O. Box 57
Mansfield, WA 98830
Represented By
Erik S Bakke, Sr
contact info
Creditor
Marten Law Group
Represented By
Steven G Jones
Marten Law Group PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Lori Masterson
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Dale D Matlack
Creditor
Duncan J McNeil, III
2030 W Spofford
Spokane, WA 99205
Creditor
Cecil E Mecham
66895 End Road
Summerville, OR 97876
Creditor
John C Mellema
Represented By
David W Christel
David W Christel Atty At Law
contact info
Creditor
Ted Metoyer
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Donald A Meyer
601 West Main Suite 714
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Peter A Witherspoon
Workland & Witherspoon PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Midtown Claims LLC
CO Eileen Shay 885 Third Avenue #3300
New York, NY 10022
Creditor
Mokuleia Polo Farms LLC
Represented By
Kenneth M Nakasone
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Creditor
Mokuleia Preservation Partners LLC
Represented By
Kenneth M Nakasone
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Creditor
Monroe County Tax Claim Bureau
1 Quaker Plaza Room 104
Stroudsburg, PA 18360
Creditor
Edna Mae Morgan
4582 20th Court S
Salem, OR 97302
Represented By
John W Campbell
Law Offices Of John W Campbell
contact info
Creditor
Earl K Morgan and EM Morgan Tr
4582 20th Court S
Salem, OR 97302
Represented By
John W Campbell
Law Offices Of John W Campbell
contact info
Creditor
Murah I Klassen Trust Dated 8/17/00
Represented By
John L Morrell
Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP
contact info
Creditor
NW Properties
Represented By
Kathryn R McKinley
Paine Hamblen LLP
contact info
Andrew A Schillinger
Layman, Layman, & Robinson, Pllp
contact info
Creditor
Richard Nail
Represented By
Joseph A Esposito^
Esposito George & Campbell
contact info
Creditor
Nationwide Life Insurance Company
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP Attn: Bradley R. Duncan 1201 Third Avenue, Suite 2200
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Bradley R Duncan
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Creditor
Edward D. Neumann
289 Kennicott Road
Chehalis, WA 98532
Represented By
Richard A Paroutaud
Mano, Mckerricher & Paroutaud Inc
contact info
Creditor
Nitze-Stagen & Co., Inc.
Represented By
Timothy W Dore
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Creditor
William G. Nixon
Represented By
Joseph A Esposito^
Esposito George & Campbell
contact info
Creditor
David A. OHara
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Ryan Michael ORourke
10109 N. Moss Lane
Spokane, WA 99208
Creditor
Oakland County Corporation Counsel
Represented By
Donald F Slavin
contact info
Creditor
Ohana Sanctuary LLC
Represented By
John Y Yamano
Mccorriston Miller Mukai Mackinnon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Old West Annuity & Life Insurance Co.
Represented By
Diana K Carey
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Ian Ledlin
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews Sheldon PLLC
contact info
Ian Ledlin^
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews & Sheldon Pll
contact info
Creditor
Gene J Omicioli
6772 Lawn Haven Drive
Huntington Beach, CA 92648
Creditor
PJM & Associates
Represented By
Andrew A Guy
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Marc D Blackman
Ransom Blackman LLP
contact info
Ronald H Hoevet
Hoevet Boise & Olson PC
contact info
Creditor
Pachulski Stank Ziehl et al
Represented By
Donald D Hackney
contact info
Creditor
Doris Pannette
Represented By
Richard A Paroutaud
Mano, Mckerricher & Paroutaud Inc
contact info
Creditor
Ronald Pellegrino
Represented By
Kevin A Bay
Ryan Swanson & Cleveland PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Lawrence E Peretti
P O Box 14139
Spokane, WA 99214
Creditor
Ailsa Petersen
Represented By
J Kirk Bromiley
Jeffers Danielson Sonn & Aylwa
contact info
Creditor
Proctor Financial Insurance
Represented By
W Keith Fendrick
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Creditor
KENNETH A RIGERT
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Paul H Trenchero
contact info
Creditor
Rehabilitator and Special Deputy Rehabilitator of Old Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Larry E Prince
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kimberly Paige Reisenauer
9518 E. Dunn Rd
Chattaroy, WA 99038
Creditor
Lois Jean Repp
Represented By
Gary J Libey
Libey Ensley Esser & Nelson PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Marvin Reynolds
Represented By
Mark W Pugsley
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Creditor
Larry Rice
4222 Olive St
Vancouver, WA 98660
Creditor
River Front Properties
Represented By
Kathryn R McKinley
Paine Hamblen LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wanda R & George E Rogers
Represented By
Robert N Faber
Hart And Winfree
contact info
Creditor
PETER J STONE
%PO BOX 1225
DEER PARK, WA 99006
Represented By
Dale L Russell
Russell Law Firm
contact info
Creditor
Randall Saccomanno
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Ronald J. Saccomanno
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Ryan S. Saccomanno
Represented By
Mark Roth
Golbeck Roth PLLC
contact info
Creditor
C. Paul Sandifur, Jr.
Represented By
Kelly P Corr
contact info
Steven W Fogg
Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner & Pree
contact info
JOHN G LAYMAN
Layman Layman Kckinley & Robinson Pllp
contact info
Andrew A Schillinger
Layman, Layman, & Robinson, Pllp
contact info
Peter H Glade
Markowitz Herbold Glade & Mehlhaf PC
contact info
Melinda M Riddle
Cairncross & Hempelmann
contact info
John R Rizzardi
Cairncross & Hempelmann
contact info
Creditor
Philip Sandifur
Represented By
JOHN G LAYMAN
Layman Layman Kckinley & Robinson Pllp
contact info
Andrew A Schillinger
Layman, Layman, & Robinson, Pllp
contact info
Creditor
Ruth E Sanford
Creditor
Dennis T Scott
Represented By
Antoni H Froehling
contact info
Creditor
f/k/a Lukins Cr. Grp The Scott Law Group Creditors Group
Represented By
Darrell W Scott
The Scott Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Western United Life Assurance Company
Represented By
Debra L Fogelman
Sonnenschein Nath Et Al
contact info
Ian Ledlin
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews Sheldon PLLC
contact info
Ian Ledlin^
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews & Sheldon Pll
contact info
Michael B Lubic
Sonnenschein Nath Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Jane Stewart
1850 Narragansett Court
San Diego, CA 92107
Creditor
John Stringham
Represented By
Mark W Pugsley
Ray Quinney & Nebeker PC
contact info
Creditor
Joanne Strong
PO Box 73747
Puyallup, WA 98373
Creditor
Steven Wallen
Represented By
Bernard W McNallen
Balsam Mcnallen
contact info
Creditor
Jeffrey D Walker
5512 Green Hills Avenue NE
Tacoma, WA 98422
Creditor
PAMELA A WEED
Dunn & Black, P.S. 10 North Post Ste. 200
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
The Scott Law Group Claimants
Represented By
Darrell W Scott
The Scott Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Seaport Group, LLC
360 Madison Ave. 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10017
Creditor
Virginia L Scott
Represented By
Antoni H Froehling
contact info
Creditor
GREGORY A WEED
Dunn & Black, P.S. 10 N. Post Ste. 200
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Robert A Dunn
Dunn Black & Roberts, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
WA State Dept of Finanical Institutions Securities Division
Represented By
Jack G Zurlini, Jr
Wa Attorney General Office
contact info
Creditor
WA State Attorney General's Office, Consumer Protection Division
Represented By
Jack G Zurlini, Jr
Wa Attorney General Office
contact info
Ian Ledlin
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews Sheldon PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Thomas G Turner
Represented By
Stephen M Rummage
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Charles S Wright
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Creditor
U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Ira H Goldman
Shipman & Goodwin
contact info
Shelley N Ripley
Witherspoon Kelley Davenport & Toole Ps
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By
John W Campbell
Law Offices Of John W Campbell
contact info
Creditor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Jennifer D Auchterlonie
U S Dept Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
Christina Urias
Represented By
Diana K Carey
Karr Tuttle Campbell
contact info
Creditor
William E Sears
Represented By
Andrew A Guy
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Ronald H Hoevet
Hoevet Boise & Olson PC
contact info
Creditor
Patricia Jean Sears-Million
Represented By
Andrew A Guy
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Marc D Blackman
Ransom Blackman LLP
contact info
Creditor
edward o schmidt, Jr
4935 W Casberg Burrgoughs Rd
Deer Park, WA 99006
Represented By
George I Diana
Diana Law Office
contact info
Creditor
Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By
Lloyd Farnham
Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Helane L Morrison
Securities & Exchange Commission
contact info
Creditor
Yvonne Dunagan Revocable Trust
Represented By
Michael F Chekian
Chekian Law Office
contact info
Creditor
Sierra Liquidity Fund
2699 White Road Suite 255
Irvine, CA 92614
Creditor
Mitch & Cindy Silver
Represented By
John M Riley, III
Witherspoon Kelley Davenport & Toole, Ps
contact info
Creditor
Linda M. & Russell Simpson
Represented By
Bernard W McNallen
Balsam Mcnallen
contact info
Creditor
Jorge E Yanez
2570 W Wrenwood
Fresno, CA 93711
Creditor
Samuel H Smith
Represented By
Terry J Price
Reed Mcclure
contact info
Earl M Sutherland
Preg O'Donnell
contact info
Creditor
William A Wilson
Represented By
Alan F Hall
Law Offices Of Alan F Hall Ps
contact info
Creditor
Robert L. Williams
Represented By
Darrell W Scott
The Scott Law Group
contact info
Creditor
Kathleen Whipps
1018 W Cleveland
Spokane, WA 99205
Represented By
John W Campbell
Law Offices Of John W Campbell
contact info
Creditor
Mrs. Helen V Spaulding
P O Box 1384
Glendale, CA 92109
Creditor
Spokane Eye Clinic Profit Sharing Plan
Lance E Olson 2034 E Southeast Blvd
Spokane, WA 99203
Creditor
Una E Westfall
3150 SW Bertha Blvd #7
Portland, OR 97239
Creditor Committee
Summit Unsecured Creditor's Committee
Represented By
Michael Diehl
Michael Diehl, Attorney At Law
contact info
Dan ORourke
Southwell & Orourke
contact info
Kevin ORourke
Southwell And O'Rourke
contact info
Creditor Committee
Metropolitan Unsecured Creditors' Committee
Randall & Danskin, P.S. 601 West Riverside Avenue Suite 1500
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Julia A Bahner
Lane Powell Spears Lubersky
contact info
Michael Diehl
Michael Diehl, Attorney At Law
contact info
Peter J Grabicki
Randall & Danskin Ps
contact info
Anthony E Grabicki
Randall & Danskin
contact info
Barry W Davidson
Davidson Backman Medeiros
contact info
Charles R Ekberg
Lane Powell PC
contact info
Susan Anne Brye
Washington Mutual Bank
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jeffrey C. Albers
Represented By
Brian M King
Davies Pearson PC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Ardith D. OBanion
1915 North 18th Avenue
Pasco, WA 99301
Examiner
Samuel R Maizel
Represented By
Donald D Hackney
contact info
Jeremy Richards
Pachulski Et Al
contact info
Financial Advisor
XRoads Solution Group
Represented By
Edward E Lyons
Xroads Solutions Group
contact info
Interested Party
Gregory A. Voeller
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Nick Von Flue
Suite 300, River Park Center 205 SE Spokane Street
Portland, OR 97202
Represented By
Robert S Banks , Jr
Banks Law Office PC
contact info
Interested Party
Trillium Corporation
Represented By
Ronald L Berenstain
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ervin Waldrep
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Gladys Waldrep
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Washington State Insurance Commissioner
Interested Party
Western United Holding Company
Riddell Williams P.S. 1001 Fourth Avenue Suite 4500
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
George E Frasier
Riddell Williams Ps
contact info
Interested Party
Gary P. Vandehey Trust
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Clarence Ben & Mary Seeley
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Erik Skaggs
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Elwin J. Smith
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
William Smith
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
The Howard & Zelda Smith Family Trust
Suite 300, River Park Center 205 SE Spokane Street
Portland, OR 97202
Represented By
Robert S Banks , Jr
Banks Law Office PC
contact info
Interested Party
William D. Snider
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
St. Paul Mercury Insurance Co.
1900 Seattle Tower Bldg. 1218 Third Ave.
Seattle, WA 98101
Represented By
Kathleen K Coghlan
Schweet Rieke & Linde PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Edward H. Stadelman Revocable Living Trust
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
William A Stady-IRA
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Gregory Strate
Represented By
Dillon E Jackson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Ralph E Sturgeon
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Summit Securities' Trust
Interested Party
Jeff L Supinger
Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole 1100 U.S. Bank Building 422 West Riverside
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Jeffrey L Supinger
Witherspoon, Kelley, Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Jeffrey L. Supinger
Witherspoon, Kelley, Davenport & Toole 1100 U.S. Bank Building 422 West Riverside
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Jeffrey L Supinger
Witherspoon, Kelley, Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Reuel C. Swanson
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
John Trimble
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Loran Trumbo
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Robert R Turner
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Robert Veley
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Gary Adams
Suite 300, River Park Center 205 SE Spokane Street
Portland, OR 97202
Represented By
Robert S Banks , Jr
Banks Law Office PC
contact info
Interested Party
Rita Adams
Suite 300, River Park Center 205 SE Spokane Street
Portland, OR 97202
Represented By
Robert S Banks , Jr
Banks Law Office PC
contact info
Interested Party
Gregory Ault
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
TRUSTEE BRUCE R BOYDEN
MIS Trustee 621 W Mallon Flour Mill 509
Spokanw, WA 99201
Represented By
Bruce R Boyden
Law Offices Of Bruce R Boyden
contact info
Mary Ellen Gaffney-Brown
Lineberger & Gaffney-Brown
contact info
Mary Ellen Gaffney-Brown^
Lineberger & Gaffney-Brown PLLC
contact info
Tom P May
contact info
Interested Party
Stephen F. Backman
Interested Party
JoeAnn Bacon
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Colleen I. Baughman
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Craig Bauske
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Karen Bauske
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
James Bentz
Suite 300, River Park Center 205 SE Spokane Street
Portland, OR 97202
Represented By
Robert S Banks , Jr
Banks Law Office PC
contact info
Interested Party
Andrew Bergman
Represented By
John D Munding
Crumb And Munding
contact info
Interested Party
Kathleen Bergman
Represented By
John D Munding
Crumb And Munding
contact info
Interested Party
Bruce J. Blohowiak
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Meryl R. Bortvedt Trust
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Gary Brajcich
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Carole V. Breese
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Donald G. Breese
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
George O. Brodersen
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Irene Brodersen
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
June J. Brown
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
COWLES PUBLISHING COMPANY
Represented By
Christopher G Varallo
Witherspoon Kelley
contact info
Interested Party
Steven Crooks
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Loren Davis
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Sheila R. Davis
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Verna Davis
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
DeBoer Revocable Living Trust Dtd 6/2/98
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Debt Acquisition Company of America V, LLC
1565 Hotel Circle South Suite 310
San Diego, CA 92108
Interested Party
David Deese
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Kathleen Deese
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Eleanor Delamarter
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Luanna L. Deming
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
William H. Deming
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Sherrill Dimbat-IRA
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Margaret L Dresbach
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Les Drew
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Harold Erfurth
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Ernst & Young LLP
Heller Ehrman White & McAuliffe LLP 701 Fifth Avenue, Suite 6100
Seattle, WA 98104
Represented By
Lori Lynn Phillips
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Lavonne Ferwerda
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Foster Pepper Tooze LLP
Interested Party
Frank J Gebhardt
Represented By
Frank J Gebhardt
Feltman, Gebhardt, Greer & Zeimantz Ps
contact info
Interested Party
Curtis Hastings
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
James V. Hawkins
Represented By
Dillon E Jackson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
B. Elaine Hoskin
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Jarmila Hudec
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Maragret Irish
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Merle Irish
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Cathryn Jiroch
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Murrl C. Jones
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Michael Kirk
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Mary Lou Kumor
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Ted Langton
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Willowdean Langton
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Don Leatherman
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Irmgard Leatherman
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
(Myron/Dorotha Lewis Lewis Living Trust Dated 6/1/90
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Charlotte C. Long
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Hanna R. Long
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Terry D. Long
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Bonnie Lundy
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Jonathan Lundy
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
KENNETH C MROCZEK
1001 Cooper Point Rd SW 140-375
Olympia, WA 98502
Interested Party
Irv Marcus
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
James T & Darlene Mears
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Metropolitan Investment Securities
Represented By
Mary Ellen Gaffney-Brown^
Lineberger & Gaffney-Brown PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Midtown Claims LLC
CO Eileen Shay 885 Third Avenue #3300
New York, NY 10022
Interested Party
Mokuleia Beach Colony
Represented By
Cuyler Shaw
Ashford & Wriston LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Neilson Elggren LLP
Represented By
Donald D Hackney
contact info
Interested Party
Robert Ness
Represented By
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Aurzella A. Osler
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Diana Pompe
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Malcom Pompe
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Robert K. Potter
Represented By
Dillon E Jackson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP Orrick Building 405 Howard St
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Frank J Gebhardt
Feltman, Gebhardt, Greer & Zeimantz Ps
contact info
Kenneth P Herzinger
Orrick Herrington
contact info
Interested Party
Leonard Riegler
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Derald Riggleman
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Charlotte M. Rodgers
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Charles B. Rothschild
Represented By
Gary I Grenley
Grenley Rotenberg Evans Bragg
contact info
Interested Party
Clayton Rudd
Represented By
Dillon E Jackson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Interested Party
Helen E. Sandifur
818 West Riverside Avenue, # 631
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
John F Bury
Murphy Bantz Bury PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Philip Sandifur
Represented By
Dillon E Jackson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
JOHN G LAYMAN
Layman Layman Kckinley & Robinson Pllp
contact info
Christine M Weaver
Law Office Of Christine M Weaver Ps
contact info
Christopher G Emch
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Brian Buckley
Fenwick & West
contact info
Other Professional
Old Standard Life Insurance Company, WA
Represented By
Robert A Faucher
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Ian Ledlin
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews Sheldon PLLC
contact info
Ian Ledlin^
Phillabaum Ledlin Matthews & Sheldon Pll
contact info
Larry E Prince
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info
Realtor
CMN Inc. dba Colliers International
Represented By
Jane Pearson
Foster Pepper PLLC
contact info
Special Counsel
ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP
Special Counsel
Huppin Ewing Anderson & Paul, P.S.
Represented By
David E Eash^
Ewing Anderson, P.S.
contact info
Special Counsel
WHITE & TOM
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
US Court House 920 W Riverside Ave, Suite 593
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Gary W Dyer
U S Trustee'S Office
contact info
Robert D Miller , Jr
U S Trustee'S Office
contact info
Gary W Dyer^
U S Trustee'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Attorney
Donald D Hackney
Terminated: 10/05/2005
120 N Wall Ste 500
Spokane, WA 99201
Represented By
Donald D Hackney
contact info
Interested Party
Seawest Investment Assoc
Terminated: 12/07/2004
Represented By
Michael J Paukert
Paukert & Troppmann P.S.
contact info
MICHAEL J PAUKERT
Paine Hamblen Et Al
contact info

GPO Aug 24 2005
MEMORANDUM Decision (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay, 4280 ). Signed on 8/24/2005. (DMS, )
GPO Oct 21 2005
MEMORANDUM Decision (RE: Motion for Relief from Stay8068 ). Signed on 10/21/2005. (DMS, )
GPO Nov 15 2006
FINDINGS of Fact re Order Barring Third-Party Claims for Contribution or Indemnity (RE: Motion 12677, Motion 12711 ). Signed on 11/15/2006. (DMS, )
GPO Nov 15 2006
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law re: Supplemental Order Authorizing Sale of Lottery Receivables (RE: MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens12642 ). Signed on 11/15/2006. (DMS, )
GPO Dec 18 2006
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Twenty-Seventh Supplemental Order Authorizing Transfer of Certain Receivables (RE: Document, 12724 ). Signed on 12/18/2006. (DMS, )
GPO Mar 05 2007
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law re Twenty-First Supplemental Order Authorizing Transfer of Certain Receivables (RE: Document, 12822 ). Signed on 3/5/2007. (DMS, )
GPO Aug 06 2007
FINDINGS of Fact (RE: MOTION to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, 12846 ). Signed on 8/6/2007. (DMS, )
GPO Jan 14 2008
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law re First Supplemental Order Authorizing Sale of Trustee Receivables Free and Clear of Liens, Select Assets Fund 1998-1 (RE: Document, 13204 ). Signed on 1/14/2008. (DMS, )
GPO Apr 10 2008
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law (RE: MOTION to Approve Compromise, , MOTION to Approve Settlement, , Motion to Shorten Time, 13372 ). Signed on 4/10/2008. (DMS, )
GPO Jun 27 2008
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re: Second Supplemental Order Authorizing Sale of Trust Receivables Free and Clear of Liens (RE: Document13425). Signed on 6/27/2008. (DMS)
GPO Dec 18 2019
FINDINGS of Fact and Conclusions of Law (RE: Motion to Authorize Sale 14600). (JL)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 12:00 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
14769 14769 misc Ch 11 Post-Confirmation Report - UST Form 11-PCR or LF 3021-1 Tue 02/18 3:23 PM
CHAPTER 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Member Case Number 04-00758 FPC11 for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 . Filed by Barry W Davidson on behalf of SUMMIT SECURITIES INC. (Davidson, Barry)
Related: [-]
14768 14768 misc Ch 11 Post-Confirmation Report - UST Form 11-PCR or LF 3021-1 Tue 02/18 3:14 PM
CHAPTER 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 12/31/2024 . Filed by Barry W Davidson on behalf of METROPOLITAN MORTGAGE & SECURITIES CO. (Davidson, Barry)
Related: [-]