South Carolina District Court
Judge:Sherri A Lydon
Case #: 0:21-cv-00721
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 08, 2021 5:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Britax Child Safety, Inc.
Represented By
Erin Patricia Lupfer
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Bryant S Caldwell
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Matthew Todd Carroll
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Mark P Henriques
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Erin McCalmon Bosman
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Kevin A Hall
Womble Bond Dickinson Us LLP
contact info
Purvi Govindlal Patel
Morrison And Foerster
contact info
Plaintiff
Tiffany Coleman
Represented By
Jonathan Betten Cohen
Greg Coleman Law PC
contact info
Harper Todd Segui
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Keli Swann
Represented By
Jonathan Betten Cohen
Greg Coleman Law PC
contact info
Harper Todd Segui
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Thursday, September 19, 2024
137 137 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/19 11:51 AM
ORDER granting 135 Joint Motion Approval of cy pres recipients. Signed by Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 9/19/2024.(apsn)
Related: [-]