Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00119
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 13, 2021 1:53 AM CST
Defendant
Devin Mitchell (1)
Represented By
Amr Adnan Ahmed
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Marjorie A Meyers
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jill Jenkins Stotts
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/13/2021 2:34 AM CST
Monday, February 08, 2021
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to Devin Mitchell (1), filed. (kmurphy, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
2 2 APPLICATION by USA as to Devin Mitchell WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM , filed.(Stotts, Jill) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
3 3 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Devin Mitchell for Initial Appearance on 02/24/2021 ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) (kmurphy, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
***Set Hearing as to Devin Mitchell: Initial Appearance set for 2/24/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (kmurphy, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Marjorie A Meyers, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Devin Mitchell, filed.(Meyers, Marjorie) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Devin Mitchell. (JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/24/2021 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Devin Mitchell, Defendant first appearance on Indictment. (Deft informed of rights). Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial Affidavit executed on the record, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing to be entered. Arraignment set for 2/26/2021 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Detention Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: AUSA Jill Stotts f/USA; AFPD Heather Hughes f/Deft.(Court Reporter: K. Miller) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed.(JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Devin Mitchell. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Devin Mitchell Arraignment & Detention Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 11:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Devin Mitchell:( Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 2/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray), **Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Devin Mitchell: (jmarchand, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amr Adnan Ahmed, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Devin Mitchell, filed.(Ahmed, Amr) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Devin Mitchell Defendant appeared with counsel. Court finds probable cause, Order of Detention Pending Trial to be entered,. Hearing conducted by video with oral consent of defendant. Appearances: AUSA Jill Stotts f/USA.(Court Reporter: L. Wells) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(JasonMarchandadi, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 27, 2021
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING Trial as to Devin Mitchell ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmarchand, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
7 7 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Devin Mitchell, filed. (ChristopherSimmons, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
9 9 Addendum as to Devin Mitchell, filed. (ChristopherSimmons, 4) [4:21-mj-00289]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
11 11 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Devin Mitchell (1) count(s) 1, 2, filed. (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
12 12 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Devin Mitchell, filed.(thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER for Issuance of Notice of Indictment as to Devin Mitchell ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified. (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Devin Mitchell - regarding11 Indictment. Arraignment set for 3/19/2021 at 02:00 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon, filed. (thanniable, 4)
Related: [-]