Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Barbara M G Lynn
Case #: 3:21-cv-00597
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Terminated:Mar 03, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Sep 12, 2021 3:37 AM CDT
Defendant
GAP Services Inc
Represented By
Nathanial L Martinez
Palter Sims Martinez PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Giltner Logistics Inc
Represented By
Nathanial L Martinez
Palter Sims Martinez PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alma Ayala
Represented By
Pamela Herrmann
Herrmann Law PLLC
contact info
Allison Hope Peregory
Herrmann Law
contact info
Drew N Herrmann
Hermann Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Daniel
Represented By
Pamela Herrmann
Herrmann Law PLLC
contact info
Allison Hope Peregory
Herrmann Law
contact info
Drew N Herrmann
Hermann Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Thursday, March 03, 2022
33 33 misc Stipulation Thu 03/03 12:43 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Shannon Daniel. (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Thu 03/03 2:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated per33 Stipulation of Dismissal. (mjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
32 32 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/01 4:19 PM
Letter from the Court to Counsel Regarding Settlement; dismissal papers due by 3/15/2022. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 3/1/2022) (svc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
31 31 2 pgs adr ADR Summary Mon 02/07 2:19 PM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by M. Beth Krugler. Attorneys in Attendance: Drew Herrmann, Allison Peregory, Nathanial Martinez. Prv Fee: $ 900 per party. Outcome of ADR: Settled as a result of ADR. (Krugler, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
30 30 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/15 9:07 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is deemed timely filed. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 12/14/2021) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
29 29 8 pgs order Protective Order Tue 11/30 3:47 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 11/30/2021) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
28 28 motion Protective Order Wed 11/10 5:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed) filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order (Agreed)
Friday, October 15, 2021
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 10/15 4:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel. (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
26 26 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/29 1:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for bench trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning 10/3/2022 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. Joinder of Parties due by 9/29/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2021. Motions due by 6/3/2022. Discovery due by 5/2/2022. Settlement Status Report due by 10/18/2021. Pretrial Order due by 9/12/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 9/12/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2022 08:30 AM before Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 9/29/2021) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
25 25 18 pgs respm Response/Objection Wed 09/22 7:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel re:21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Herrmann, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Friday, September 03, 2021
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 09/03 4:43 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
23 23 respm Response/Objection Wed 09/01 4:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc re:19 Request for Clerk to Issue Document (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Request for Entry of Default
22 22 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Wed 09/01 4:57 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc re21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/01 4:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 09/01 4:55 PM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - Defendants' Initial Disclosures,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time
19 19 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 09/01 2:21 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default Judgment filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel. (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
misc Remark Thu 09/02 11:23 AM
Clerk declines to enter default as an attempt to defend has been made. (mjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/16 7:30 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shannon Daniel, Alma Ayala. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Shannon Daniel Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Alma Ayala Notice of Consent
Friday, July 30, 2021
17 17 misc Status Report Fri 07/30 11:11 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel. (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 26, 2021
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 07/26 11:35 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss and the Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their Complaint, within 21 days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/26/2021) (jmg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
15 15 10 pgs respm Response/Objection Fri 06/11 8:18 PM
RESPONSE filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel re:7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (Herrmann, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/28 12:49 PM
ORDER granting in part10 Motion to Stay Discovery. The parties' response to the Courts Order Requiring Scheduling Conference and Report for Contents of Scheduling Order [ECF No.9 ] is 7/30/201. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/28/2021) (axm)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Tue 06/01 2:57 PM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadline set per14 Order. Responses due by 7/30/2021. (mla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/27 11:05 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 6/11/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/27/2021) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/26 3:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ,8 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/26 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allison Hope Peregory on behalf of Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Peregory, Allison)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
10 10 motion Stay Tue 05/25 9:47 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, May 10, 2021
9 9 4 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Mon 05/10 10:33 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order due by 5/31/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 5/10/2021) (twd)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 07, 2021
8 8 11 pgs respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Fri 05/07 1:42 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc re7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ,1 Complaint,,,,, (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 05/07 1:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/16 10:32 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is 5/7/2021. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/16/2021) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/15 2:33 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics IncAttorney Nathanial L Martinez added to party GAP Services Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Nathanial L Martinez added to party Giltner Logistics Inc(pty:dft) (Martinez, Nathanial)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/16 4:26 PM
Summons Issued as to GAP Services Inc, Giltner Logistics Inc. (hml)
Related: [-]
3 3 qcref Lynn Tue 03/16 4:23 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 03/16 10:48 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alma Ayala, Shannon Daniel. (Herrmann, Drew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/16 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against GAP Services, Inc., Giltner Logistics, Inc. filed by Shannon Daniel, Alma Ayala. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11698958) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Herrmann, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) FLSA Consent Shannon Daniel,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) FLSA Consent Alma Ayala