METCALF v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00440 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 06, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00524 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 12, 2021 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH METCALF
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
30+
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 05/10 12:08 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/6/2022. (lsd) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/05 12:55 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOSEPH METCALF. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/05 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JOSEPH METCALF (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/05 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JOSEPH METCALF (REAMS, JARED) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/05 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JOSEPH METCALF (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/16 3:31 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaints due by 4/5/2021 .) (djb) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 03/16 11:19 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00524. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-98) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.] | |
Wednesday, February 24, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL Direct list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-524 (JRT/KMM). (KNK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8530784) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |