Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:21-bk-30936
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Jun 09, 2021
Claims Deadline:Jul 23, 2021

Debtor
Brilliant Energy, LLC, Debtor
800 Wilcrest Dr
Houston, TX 77042-6301
Represented By
Matthew Scott Okin
Okin & Adams LLP
contact info
Debtor
Brilliant Energy, LLC
800 Wilcrest Dr
Houston, TX 77042-6301
Represented By
Matthew Scott Okin
Okin & Adams LLP
contact info
Timothy L. Wentworth
Okin Adams, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randy W Williams
Byman & Associates PLLC 7924 Broadway Suite 104
Pearland, TX 77581
Represented By
Bruce J Ruzinsky
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Craig Alexander Higginbotham
Byman & Associates, PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Nan Roberts Eitel
Executive Office For U.S. Trustees
contact info
Vianey Garza
Doj-Ust
contact info
Millie Aponte Sall
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Jessica L Hanzlik
United States Trustee Program
contact info
Alicia Lenae Barcomb
Doj-Ust
contact info
Jana Smith Whitworth
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 10:56 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) [system event] Tue 03/16 12:17 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Filed by Brilliant Energy, LLC. (Okin, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/16 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David A Zdunkewicz Filed by on behalf of DTE Energy Trading, Inc. (Zdunkewicz, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 10 pgs motion Emergency Motion Tue 03/16 4:56 PM
Emergency Motion DTE Energy Trading, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Convert Chapter 7 Case to Chapter 11 and for Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by Creditor DTE Energy Trading, Inc. (Zdunkewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
4 4 4 pgs misc Declaration Tue 03/16 5:00 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Gregory V. Staton in Support of DTE Energy Trading, Inc.'s Emergency Motion to Convert Chapter 7 Case to Chapter 11 and for Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee (Filed By DTE Energy Trading, Inc. ) Related [+] (Zdunkewicz, David)
Related: [-] 3 Emergency Motion
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/16 5:01 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Peter S. Partee, Sr. . Filed by Creditor DTE Energy Trading, Inc. (Guffy, Philip)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear pro hac vice Tue 03/16 5:02 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Robert A. Rich . Filed by Creditor DTE Energy Trading, Inc. (Guffy, Philip)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs misc Exhibit List Tue 03/16 6:40 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By DTE Energy Trading, Inc. ) Related [+] (Zdunkewicz, David)
Related: [-] 3 Emergency Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit 1