Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00477
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00605
Last checked: Sunday Sep 12, 2021 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PAUL WEDEL
Represented By
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 05, 2021
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/05 10:18 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PAUL WEDEL. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/05 10:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of PAUL WEDEL (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/05 10:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of PAUL WEDEL (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/05 10:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of PAUL WEDEL (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
8 8 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/16 3:31 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaints due by 4/5/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 03/16 3:02 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00605. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/16 9:37 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE: This case has been transferred/extracted to the Northern District of Florida. (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
5 5 3 pgs order Order Tue 03/16 9:35 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-98) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(MMP) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (MMP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-605 (JRT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8555896) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 3/16/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet