California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:21-cv-01882
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2021
Terminated:Oct 15, 2021
Case in other court:San Mateo County Superior Court, 20-CV-05668
Last checked: Monday Sep 13, 2021 3:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Attorneys for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation Casey Law Group 16450 Los Gatos Boulevard Suite 110
Los Gatos, CA 95032
Represented By
Arthur J. Casey
Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, LLP
contact info
Donald P. Gagliardi
Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICIA PIPLICK
Represented By
Matthew Wertheim
Law Offices Of Matthew Wertheim
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 15, 2021
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/15 8:50 AM
NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND STIPULATIN OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL(Casey, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, October 14, 2021
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 10/14 10:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f)(2), Civil Local Rules 16-9 and 16-10(d), and Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu's Standing Order, the parties' Joint Case Management Statement was due to be filed by 10/13/2021. The parties have not yet filed a Joint Case Management Statement. Therefore, they shall file a Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 5:00 p.m. P.T. on 10/14/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/14/2021 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 08, 2021
19 19 misc Association of Counsel Thu 07/08 2:27 PM
ASSOCIATION of Counsel / Change of Firm Name for Counsel for Costco Wholesale Corporation by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Casey, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
18 18 6 pgs order Order Wed 06/16 2:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. See Order for all dates set by the Court. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/16/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Trial Exhibit Markers
17 17 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 06/16 2:06 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2021. Case referred to Private ADR. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2021. Updated Case Management Statement due by 10/13/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Oakland. Close of Fact Discovery due by 4/26/2022. Designation of Experts due by 4/26/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/10/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/24/2021. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 6/23/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2022 at 03:00 PM in Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Jury Selection and Jury Trial (7 days) set for 9/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. FTR Time: 10:02-10:09. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2021)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Wed 06/16 2:17 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmfS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 13, 2021
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Sun 06/13 9:13 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference is set for 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telep hone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
15 15 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 06/08 3:20 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Gagliardi, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 24, 2021
14 14 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 05/24 3:02 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gagliardi, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
13 13 misc Refund Status Mon 04/12 5:06 PM
Refund Status re12 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
12 12 misc Application for Refund Thu 04/08 9:29 AM
Application for Refund re1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-15713753 by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Casey, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/01 10:10 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PATRICIA PIPLICK.. (Wertheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 04/01 9:33 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2021. (amgS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/30 10:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Gagliardi, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
8 8 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/29 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PATRICIA PIPLICK re7 Notice of Appearance (Wertheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/29 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wertheim (Wertheim, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/24 11:22 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCostco Wholesale Corporation.(Gagliardi, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
5 5 order 1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 03/23 10:58 AM
ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 3 : Initial Case Management Conference rescheduled to 6/16/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/23/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 03/23 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, (Gagliardi, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 03/17 1:33 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 03/17 1:08 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/17 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 20-CIV-05668. with jury demand (no process)(Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15713753). Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Gagliardi, Donald) Modified on 3/17/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Exhibit A&B,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet