Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael R Barrett
Case #: 1:21-cv-00183
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2021
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Sep 13, 2021 5:41 AM EDT
Defendant
WNB Group LLC
dba The Ray Hamilton Moving Company 4817 Section Road
Cincinnati, OH 45212
Represented By
Stephen E Imm
Finney Law Firm
contact info
Casey A. Jones
Finney Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jay Wallis
6326 Trail Ridge Court
Loveland, OH 45140
Represented By
Stephen E Imm
Finney Law Firm
contact info
Casey A. Jones
Finney Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorna Vinsant
723 Western Avenue
Covington, KY 41011
Represented By
Mark Joseph Byrne
contact info

GPO Dec 27 2022
OPINION & ORDER - Defendants Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs Counsel and Stay Discovery (Doc. 8) is DENIED... Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 12/27/2021. (bjc)
GPO Jul 29 2024
ORDER denying 43 Plaintiff Lorna Vinsant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 40 Defendants WNB Group, LLC dba The Ray Hamilton Moving Company and Jay Wallis' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claim for wrongful termination in violation of public policy (Count Three) remains pending; all other claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 7/29/2024. (kkz)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
111 111 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 04/02 10:07 AM
USCA Case Number 25-3228 for110 Notice of Appeal filed by Lorna Vinsant, Joshua K., Case Manager (513-564-7013). (kh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
110 110 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 03/31 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re68 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,109 Clerk's Judgment (Filing fee $ 605 has been paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10442345) by Plaintiff Lorna Vinsant. (Byrne, Mark)
Related: [-]