Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:21-mj-00594
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2021
Terminated:Apr 06, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Mar 18, 2021 2:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Victoria Alyssa Canales (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Material Witness
Brenda Josselin Aguilera-Lopez
Represented By
Arturo Gallegos
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 04/08/2021 12:22 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
1 1 2 pgs Proposed COMPLAINT as to Victoria Alyssa Canales (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 3/17/2021 at 01:33 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Victoria Alyssa Canales, filed.(dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Brenda Josselin Aguilera-Lopez as to Victoria Alyssa Canales. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 3/17/2021 at 01:33 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos, filed.(dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on March 16, 2021 at 05:28 PM as to Victoria Alyssa Canales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]