California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Referred: Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:21-cv-01418
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2021
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, RG20082878
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 25, 2021 1:47 AM PDT
Defendant
Thomson Reuters Corporation
Represented By
Nicola Carah Menaldo
Perkins Coie
contact info
Gabriella Gallego
Perkins Coie
contact info
Susan D. Fahringer
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Anna Mouw Thompson
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cat Brooks
Represented By
Jennifer Dale Bennett
Gupta Wessler PLLC
contact info
Andre M. Mura
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Albert Fox Cahn
Surveillance Technology Oversight Project
contact info
Andre Michel Mura
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Neil Kumar Sawhney
Gupta Wessler PLLC
contact info
Benjamin D. Elga
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Jeffrey B. Kosbie
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Alice Buttrick
Justice Catalyst Law, Inc.
contact info
Amanda M. Karl
Gibbs Law Group
contact info
Eric H. Gibbs
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rasheed Shabazz
Represented By
Jennifer Dale Bennett
Gupta Wessler PLLC
contact info
Andre M. Mura
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Albert Fox Cahn
Surveillance Technology Oversight Project
contact info
Andre Michel Mura
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Neil Kumar Sawhney
Gupta Wessler PLLC
contact info
Benjamin D. Elga
Justice Catalyst Law
contact info
Jeffrey B. Kosbie
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info
Alice Buttrick
Justice Catalyst Law, Inc.
contact info
Amanda M. Karl
Gibbs Law Group
contact info
Eric H. Gibbs
Gibbs Law Group LLP
contact info

GPO May 07 2021
ORDER Granting 31 STIPULATION re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss: Responses due by 5/19/2021. Replies due by 6/9/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 05/07/2021. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
GPO Aug 16 2021
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/2021. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2021)
GPO Mar 25 2022
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 81 Parties' Joint Discovery Letter Brief of March 24, 2022. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
GPO Nov 03 2022
ORDER REGARDING 9/22/2022 DISCOVERY LETTER Re: Dkt. No. 109 Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/3/2022. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2022)
GPO Sep 16 2024
ORDER re 241 Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
284 284 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 04/11 3:16 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cat Brooks, Rasheed Shabazz. Amendment to283 Notice (Other) of Change of Firm Name . (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]
283 283 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/11 2:54 PM
NOTICE by Cat Brooks, Rasheed Shabazz of Change of Firm Name (Mura, Andre)
Related: [-]