Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:21-bk-12567
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2021
Claims Deadline:May 27, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Dec 22, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
iCan Benefit Group, LLC
5301 N Federal Hwy Ste 100
Boca Raton, FL 33487-4908
Represented By
Robert P. Charbonneau, Esq.
Agentis PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
719 719 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report (UST Form 11-PCR) Thu 04/10 9:53 AM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for Quarter Ending 3/31/2025 Filed by Liquidator Alan Barbee. (Dorsey, Patrick)
Related: [-]