California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:21-cv-00494
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2021
Terminated:Sep 28, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 14, 2021 1:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Tory Burch LLC
Represented By
Emily A. Papania
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Whitaker
Represented By
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Dennis J. Price
Center For Disability Access
contact info

GPO May 13 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs Complaint on or before 5/28/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO May 28 2021
STIPULATION and ORDER 8 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/28/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint on or before 6/11/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Jul 07 2021
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/7/2021 DIRECTING the parties to contact the court's VDRP administrator within 14 days; STAYING this action with a Joint Status Report due within 5 days after completing the VDRP session; DIRECTING the parties to complete the VDRP session by 10/18/2021; RESETTING the Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and DIRECTING the parties to submit an Amended Joint Status Report by 11/8/2021 if a settlement is not reached through VDRP. Any objections to this referral to the VDRP due within 7 days. (Coll, A)
GPO Jul 29 2021
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/29/2021 DIRECTING the parties to file a Stipulation for Dismissal by 9/27/2021, or to file a Joint Status Report by that date if settlement has not been finalized. (Coll, A)

Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/28 12:06 AM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL pursuant to federal rule of civil procedure 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) jointly by Brian Whitaker. (Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/28 10:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to the17 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed 9/28/2021, THIS ACTION IS TERMINATED, and all pending dates and deadlines are VACATED. Each party to bear his/her/its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 09, 2021
adr Removal from VDRP Mon 08/09 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from VDRP. A Notice of Settlement14 has been filed.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 07/29 11:08 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/29/2021 DIRECTING the parties to file a Stipulation for Dismissal by 9/27/2021, or to file a Joint Status Report by that date if settlement has not been finalized. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 28, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/28 3:12 PM
NOTICE of SETTLEMENT and Request to vacate all currently set dates by Brian Whitaker. Dispositional Docs due by 8/23/2021.(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
13 13 2 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 07/07 11:48 AM
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/7/2021 DIRECTING the parties to contact the court's VDRP administrator within 14 days; STAYING this action with a Joint Status Report due within 5 days after completing the VDRP session; DIRECTING the parties to complete the VDRP session by 10/18/2021; RESETTING the Initial Scheduling Conference for 11/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and DIRECTING the parties to submit an Amended Joint Status Report by 11/8/2021 if a settlement is not reached through VDRP. Any objections to this referral to the VDRP due within 7 days. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 06, 2021
12 12 misc Scheduling Report Tue 07/06 4:51 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Price, Dennis J. added. (Price, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 11, 2021
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/11 11:17 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Tory Burch LLC. (Papania, Emily)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/11 11:16 AM
ANSWER by Tory Burch LLC.(Papania, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
9 9 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 05/28 11:27 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER8 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/28/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's Complaint on or before 6/11/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/28 10:14 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC.(Papania, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 13, 2021
7 7 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/13 5:11 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/13/2021 extending time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs Complaint on or before 5/28/2021. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 05/12 9:29 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC.(Papania, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 04/14 5:05 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Tory Burch LLC. Attorney Papania, Emily A. added. (Papania, Emily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/06 2:10 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Tory Burch LLC served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for WBS Thu 03/18 10:34 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Thu 03/18 10:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Tory Burch LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Lockhart Seabock* *Center for Disability Access* *8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200* *San Diego, CA 92111*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/18 4:30 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Brian Whitaker. Attorney Seabock, Amanda Lockhart added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9483956)(Seabock, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet