LOVATO v. JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50309
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50309
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Gregg W Zive |
Case #: | 3:21-ap-05047 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA W. LOVATO, TRUSTEE OF THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF NETWORK SERVICES SOLUTIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
P.O. BOX 18417
RENO, NV 89511 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Friday, October 28, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 10/28 10:01 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Tue 11/30 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Entry of Order (Adv)
Tue 11/30 10:38 AM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
orderad
Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Tue 11/23 1:48 PM
Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, November 02, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Tue 11/02 2:05 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement Agreement Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Dismissal (case)
Tue 11/02 2:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Settlement Agreement Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Off Calendar (Adv)
Tue 10/19 2:29 PM
Scheduling Conference Off Calendar (dcl) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv)
Tue 07/13 2:59 PM
Scheduling Conference Rescheduled. 8/5/21 Adversary Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 10/21/2021 at 10:00 AM at GWZ Teleconference Line. (dcl) |
|
21 | 21
order
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)
Tue 07/13 2:24 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order (mmm) |
|
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Wed 06/23 9:23 AM
Certificate of Service of Second Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint and Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
19 | 19
adv_misc
Stipulation (Adv)
Wed 06/23 9:21 AM
Second Stipulation By CHRISTINA W. LOVATO and Between Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint and Continue Scheduling Conference Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Tue 06/15 4:03 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Firm Name Change Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Adv)
Tue 06/15 4:02 PM
Notice of Firm Name Change Filed by ELIZABETH A. FLETCHER on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (FLETCHER, ELIZABETH) |
|
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Tue 06/01 1:52 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry of Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Entry of Order (Adv)
Tue 06/01 1:48 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Friday, May 28, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)
Fri 05/28 2:52 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order (mmm) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Mon 05/17 8:10 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Extend Deadline For Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
12 | 12
adv_misc
Stipulation (Adv)
Mon 05/17 8:04 AM
Stipulation By CHRISTINA W. LOVATO and Between Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/23 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. 4/23/2021 Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/23 3:21 PM
Summons Service Executed on JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. 4/23/2021 Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/23 3:20 PM
Summons Service Executed on JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. 4/23/2021 Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
8 | 8
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 04/23 11:02 AM
(NONCONFORMING ENTRY) Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) Modified on 4/23/2021 to reflect duplicate entry - see #7 (Gallagher, DA) |
|
7 | 7
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 04/23 11:00 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Fri 04/23 10:58 AM
Summons Issued on JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. (mmm) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 04/22 11:52 AM
Request to Issue Summons On: JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.. Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 03/19 10:52 AM
Summons Issued on JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. (cly) |
|
3 | 3
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 03/19 10:51 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 03/18 1:02 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-05047 gwz) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 20072194, fee amount $ 350.00 (HIGH, ELIZABETH) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/18 12:46 PM
Adversary case 21-05047 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preference Payments Under 11 U.S.C. §547 Filed by CHRISTINA W. LOVATO vs. JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(HIGH, ELIZABETH) |