LOVATO v. EARTHLINK, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50309
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-50309
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Gregg W Zive |
Case #: | 3:21-ap-05049 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
EARTHLINK, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA W. LOVATO, TRUSTEE OF THE BANKRUPTCY ESTATE OF NETWORK SERVICES SOLUTIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY
P.O. BOX 18417
RENO, NV 89511 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:06 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/14 2:13 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Mon 06/14 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Entry of Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint and Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Entry of Order (Adv)
Mon 06/14 2:22 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Approving Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint and Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
14 | 14
order
Dismissing Case with Prejudice
Mon 06/14 12:36 PM
Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice (mmm) |
|
13 | 13
order
Stipulated/Agreed Order (Bk)
Mon 06/14 12:29 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order (mmm) |
|
Thursday, June 10, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Thu 06/10 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Dismissal (case)
Thu 06/10 3:12 PM
Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
adv_misc
Certificate of Service (ADV)
Thu 05/27 8:02 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Extend Deadline For Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
9 | 9
adv_misc
Stipulation (Adv)
Thu 05/27 7:58 AM
Stipulation By CHRISTINA W. LOVATO and Between Defendant Earthlink, LLC to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 04/23 3:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on EARTHLINK, LLC 4/23/2021 Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Fri 04/23 11:06 AM
Summons Issued on EARTHLINK, LLC (mmm) |
|
6 | 6
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 04/23 11:05 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (mmm) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 04/22 11:53 AM
Request to Issue Summons On: EARTHLINK, LLC. Filed by ELIZABETH A. HIGH on behalf of CHRISTINA W. LOVATO (HIGH, ELIZABETH) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Fri 03/19 10:56 AM
Summons Issued on EARTHLINK, LLC (cly) |
|
3 | 3
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 03/19 10:55 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 03/18 1:02 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-05049 gwz) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 20072194, fee amount $ 350.00 (HIGH, ELIZABETH) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/18 12:52 PM
Adversary case 21-05049 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preference Payment Under 11 U.S.C. §547 Filed by CHRISTINA W. LOVATO vs. EARTHLINK, LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(HIGH, ELIZABETH) |