Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00039
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2021
Terminated:Nov 03, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 26, 2022 10:21 PM EDT
Defendant
Ericka Sheree Oliver (1)
Represented By
Marvin David Miller
contact info
Bret Danwill Offan Lee
Robinson Law PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Lorenzo Williams (3)
Represented By
Benjamin Nakayama Griffitts
Robinson Law PLLC
contact info
David Thomas Williams
William B Cummings PC
contact info
Lana Marie Manitta
The Law Office Of Lana Manitta, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin N. Griffitts
Robinson Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rachel Marie Roberts
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Bibeane Metsch
Us Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Taurean Alphonso Venable (2)
Terminated: 04/12/2022
Represented By
Jesse Isaac Winograd
The Law Office Of Jesse Winograd PLLC
contact info
Robert Lee Jenkins, Jr.
Bynum & Jenkins PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/30/2024 11:14 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 20, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
2 2 21 pgs AFFIDAVIT by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams1 Complaint (Sealed) (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Granting5 Motion to Seal Case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/20/2020. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2020
8 8 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/20 in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff via Zoom:Initial Appearance as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 10/21/2020. US appeared through: Bibeane Metsch. Deft appeared w/o counsel. Deft consents to VTC. Deft informed of rights, charges and penalties. Court to appoint counsel. Conflict list submitted. Govt's request for detention - GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Deft remanded.(Tape #FTR.)(cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
10 10 VIDEO OR TELEPHONE CONFERENCING ORDER for Criminal Proceedings as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/21/20. (cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
11 11 Temporary Detention Order as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/21/20. (cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2020
CJA 20 as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams :Appointment of Attorney David Thomas Williams for Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/22/20. (cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/21/2020 in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff via Zoom:Preliminary Hearing as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 10/23/2020. US appeared through: Rachel Roberts and Bibeane Metsch. Deft appeared w/counsel: David Williams. Deft consents to VTC. Govt adduced evidence - Rests. Affidavit entered into evidence as Govt's Exhibit #1. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 10/23/2020. Deft argued for bond - DENIED. Govt's request for detention - GRANTED. Deft REMANDED. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/23/20. (cmar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 27, 2020
16 16 2 pgs Consent Motion for Entry of a Stipulated Protective Order by USA. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
17 17 3 pgs ORDER Granting16 Motion for Protective Order as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/04/2020. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
18 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict; ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including December 20, 2020 as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/10/2020. (c/s to counsel) (jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
20 20 Notice and Motion for Substitution of Counsel, filed by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 17, 2020
21 21 ORDERED that the Motion to Substitute Counsel is GRANTED; that Benjamin N. Griffitts is substituted as counsel of record and David Thomas Williams is relieved of further representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 11/17/2020. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 03, 2020
22 22 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (aott, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER granting22 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/3/2020. (aott, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
24 24 SECOND CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict; ORDERED that the time period for indicting the defendant be and is hereby extended up to and including January 21, 2021 as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams (1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/08/2020. (c/s to counsel of record) (jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
26 26 MOTION for Reconsideration of Bond by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams26 MOTION for Reconsideration : Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
28 28 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Indict and Memorandum in Support by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams.(choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
29 29 ORDERED that the deadline to indict the defendant in this matter is hereby extended to March 19, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 01/21/2021. (choy, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
30 30 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff via zoom:Docket Call as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 1/26/2021. US appeared through Rachel Roberts and Bibeane Metsch. Defendant appeared through counsel Lana Manitta. Matter continued to January 28, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Motion Hearing reset for 1/28/2021 at 03:30 PM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
31 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff via Zoom:Motion Hearing as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 1/28/2021re26 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. US appeared through Rachel Roberts and Bibeane Metsch. Deft appeared with counsel Lana Manitta. Deft consents to VTC. Matter argued and denied. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
32 32 For the reasons stated from the bench, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants motion is DENIED re26 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/29/2021. (lcre, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
33 33 MOTION for Review and Revocation of Magistrate Judge's Detention Order by the District Court by Brandon Lorenzo Williams. (shea) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (1), Taurean Alphonso Venable (2). (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit Con't,
Att: 3 2 pgs Affidavit Con't
2 2 MOTION to Seal Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 49(B)by USA as to Ericka Sheree Oliver, Taurean Alphonso Venable. (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (1), Taurean Alphonso Venable (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/8/2021. (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
4 4 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
7 7 Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
9 9 Arrest Warrant Issued in case as to Taurean Alphonso Venable. (aott,c/s usms ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
34 34 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams33 MOTION : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (shea) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
Case unsealed as to Ericka Sheree Oliver, Taurean Alphonso Venable (dest, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
CJA 20 as to Taurean Alphonso Venable: Appointment of Attorney - Jesse Isaac Winograd for Taurean Alphonso Venable. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
10 10 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/9/2021 as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. (aott) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/9/2021 in case as to Taurean Alphonso Venable. (aott, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Appearance as to Ericka Sheree Oliver held on 2/9/2021 via ZoomGov. US appeared through: Bibeane Metsch. Deft appeared without counsel. Deft consents to proceed with video conference. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Deft will retain counsel. Gov't is seeking detention - GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) Modified on 2/9/2021 to correct hearing location (wgar, ). [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER AS TO ERIKA SHEREE OLIVER. In accordance with General Order 2021-01 entered by Chief Judge Davis on January 8, 2021 (2:20mc07), this court finds that the defendant has consented to the use of video conferencing to conduct the initial appearance hearing that was heard in this court on February 9, 2021, as authorized by §15002(b)(1) of the CARES Act, H.R. 748, 116th Congress (2020). The court finds that this proceeding falls within the class of "critical" proceedings that should not be delayed in light of the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/09/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
15 15 Temporary Detention Order as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/09/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Appearance as to Taurean Alphonso Venable held on 2/9/2021 via ZoomGov. US appeared through: Bibeane Metsch. Deft appeared without counsel. Deft consents to proceed with video conference. Deft informed of rights, charges, and penalties. Court to appoint counsel - CJA - conflict list submitted. Gov't is seeking detention - GRANTED pending PH/DH. Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER AS TO TAUREAN ALPHONSO VENABLE. In accordance with General Order 2021-01 entered by Chief Judge Davis on January 8, 2021 (2:20mc07), this court finds that the defendant has consented to the use of video conferencing to conduct the initial appearance hearing that was heard in this court on February 9, 2021, as authorized by §15002(b)(1) of the CARES Act, H.R. 748, 116th Congress (2020). The court finds that this proceeding falls within the class of "critical" proceedings that should not be delayed in light of the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/09/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
19 19 Temporary Detention Order as to Taurean Alphonso Venable. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/09/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
Reset Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams33 MOTION for Review and Revocation of Magistrate Judge's Detention Order. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (Per MH) (clar, ) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
20 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Marvin David Miller appearing for Ericka Sheree Oliver (Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
21 21 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. (smith, teneisha) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
22 22 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Taurean Alphonso Venable. (pet, leo) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Docket Call as to Ericka Sheree Oliver held on 2/11/2021 via ZoomGov. US appeared through: Rachel Roberts. Deft appeared with counsel: Marvin Miller. Matter came on for PH/DH. Deft consents to proceed with video conference.Counsel for the parties and the defendant were orally advised of the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Deft requests to continue the PH/DH - GRANTED. PH/DH reset. Detention and Preliminary Hearing reset for 2/18/2021 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER AS TO ERICKA SHEREE OLIVER - In accordance with General Order 2021-01 entered by Chief Judge Davis onJanuary 8, 2021 (2:20mc07), this court finds that the defendant, with the advice of counsel, has consented to the use of video conferencing to conduct the preliminary / detention hearing that was heard in this court on February 11, 2021, as authorized by§ 15002(b)(1) of the CARES Act, H.R. 748, 116th Congress (2020). The court finds that this proceeding falls within the class of "critical" proceedings that should not bedelayed in light of the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Ericka Sheree Oliver . Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
26 26 Temporary Detention Order as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Preliminary Hearing as to Taurean Alphonso Venable held on 2/11/2021 via ZoomGov. US appeared through: Rachel Roberts. Deft appeared with counsel: Jesse Winograd. Deft consents to proceed with video conference. Counsel for the parties and the defendant were orally advised of the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Gov't adduced evidence and rests. Affidavit entered into evidence as gov't exhibit no. 1. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to Taurean Alphonso Venable held on 2/11/2021 via ZoomGov. Deft argues for release with conditions - DENIED - Deft remanded. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
28 28 ORDER - In accordance with General Order 2021-01 entered by Chief Judge Davis on January 8, 2021 (2:20mc07), this court finds that the defendant, with the advice of counsel, has consented to the use of video conferencing to conduct the preliminary / detention hearing that was heard in this court on February 11, 2021, as authorized by §15002(b)(1) of the CARES Act, H.R. 748, 116th Congress (2020). The court finds that this proceeding falls within the class of "critical" proceedings that should not be delayed in light of the COVID-19 pandemic. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
29 29 ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), the Court ORDERS the United States to adhere to the disclosure obligations set forth in Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Brady v. Maryland instructs that the suppression by the prosecution of evidence favorable to an accused violates due process where the evidence is material either to guilt or to punishment, irrespective of the good faith or bad faith of the prosecution. 373 U.S. at 87. Failure to adhere to this requirement may result in serious consequences, up to and including vacating a conviction or disciplinary action against the prosecution. Having given counsel the oral admonition required by the Due Process Protections Act, this Order serves as the reminder of prosecutorial obligation and duties in accordance with Rule 5(f) and the Eastern District of Virginia Standing Order concerning the same as to Taurean Alphonso Venable . Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Taurean Alphonso Venable. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/11/2021. (wgar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs ORDERED that the above-captioned case be unsealed. as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 02/11/2021. (jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
38 38 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams.(jlan) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, February 12, 2021
36 36 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule re33 MOTION by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams.(Metsch, Bibeane) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 ORDER granting36 Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule re 33 MOTION; directing that on or before February 17, 2021, the Government file its response to33 Defendant's Motion for Review and Revocation of Magistrate Judge's Detention Order. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 2/12/2021. (shea) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
31 31 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Ericka Sheree Oliver, Taurean Alphonso Venable.(Roberts, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
32 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Ericka Sheree Oliver, Taurean Alphonso Venable. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/17/2021. (see Order for details) (dest, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
33 33 MOTION for Bond by Ericka Sheree Oliver.(Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 supporting memorandum,
Att: 2 support letters
34 34 Notice of Hearing Date re33 MOTION for Bond (Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
39 39 RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams re33 MOTION (Roberts, Rachel) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
35 35 Addendum to Pretrial Services Bond Report (Sealed Document) as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (smith, teneisha) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
36 36 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis:Preliminary Hearing via ZoomGov as to Ericka Sheree Oliver held on 2/18/2021. US appeared through: Rachel Roberts. Deft appeared with counsel: Marvin Miller. Gov't adduced evidence and rests. Affidavit admitted into evidence as gov't exhibit number one. Court finds PC. Matter continued for further proceedings before the Grand Jury. Detention Hearing as to Ericka Sheree Oliver held on 2/18/2021. Gov't seeks detention. Deft argues for release with conditions - DENIED. Deft is remanded to the custody of the USMS due to risk of non-appearance. (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
37 37 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Ericka Sheree Oliver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/19/2021. (lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 20, 2021
38 38 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Taurean Alphonso Venable. (Jenkins, Robert) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 21, 2021
39 39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order by Taurean Alphonso Venable.(Jenkins, Robert) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letters of Support
40 40 ORDER granting38 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Taurean Alphonso Venable (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/21/2021. (dest, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
40 40 REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Brandon Lorenzo Williams re39 Response in Opposition to Motion for Review and Revocation (Manitta, Lana) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
41 41 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Marie S. Zisa appearing for USA. (Zisa, Marie) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
41 41 TRANSCRIPT excerpt of Proceedings held on 2/18/2021, before Judge Ivan D. Davis. Court reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/24/2021.(thomson, anneliese) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
42 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr: Motion Hearing as to Brandon Lorenzo Williams held on 2/24/2021. US appeared through: Marie Zisa and Rachael Roberts. Deft appeared w/counsel Lana Manitta. Defendant's33 Motion for Review and Revocation of Magistrate Judges Detention Order - Argued and Denied. Counsel to coordinate with law clerk regarding access to the defendant at the jail, if necessary. Deft remanded. (tarm) [1:20-mj-00291-MSN-RDA]
Related: [-]
42 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MOTION for Bond filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver by Ericka Sheree Oliver.(Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 1 pgs Letter
43 43 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 1, 2021 re39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order (Jenkins, Robert) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
Set Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Taurean Alphonso Venable39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Reset Deadlines re Motion or Report and Recommendation in case as to Taurean Alphonso Venable39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order . Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (Per DW) (clar, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Set Deadlines: re42 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MOTION for Bond filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver . Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lgue, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
44 44 Opposition by USA as to Ericka Sheree Oliver re42 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MOTION for Bond filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver (Metsch, Bibeane) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
45 45 Addendum to Pretrial Services Bond Report (Sealed Document) as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (smith, teneisha) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
46 46 3 pgs REPLY TO RESPONSE to by Ericka Sheree Oliver re42 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MOTION for Bond filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver ,33 MOTION for Bond ,44 Opposition (Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
47 47 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (1) PR bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/1/2021. (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
48 48 Opposition by USA as to Taurean Alphonso Venable re39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order (Metsch, Bibeane) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
49 49 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis via Zoom:Motion Hearing as to Ericka Sheree Oliver held on 3/1/2021 re42 MOTION for Reconsideration re33 MOTION for Bond filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver filed by Ericka Sheree Oliver. Argued and GRANTED. Deft placed on PR bond with conditions. (Tape #FTR.)(lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
50 50 3 pgs PR Bond with conditions Entered as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (lcre, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
51 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady: Motion Hearing as to Taurean Alphonso Venable held on 3/4/2021 re:39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order filed by Taurean Alphonso Venable. USA appeared through Bibeane Metsch and Marie Zisa. Defendant appeared with counsel Robert L. Jenkins, Jr. Matter argued.39 MOTION to Revoke Magistrate Detention Order filed by Taurean Alphonso Venable - DENIED. Order to follow. Defendant Remanded. Court Reporter: S. Wallace (pmil) (pmil, ). [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/4/2021) Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 (3/4/2021) Exhibit 2
Friday, March 05, 2021
52 52 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Ericka Sheree Oliver.(Roberts, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
53 53 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by USA as to Taurean Alphonso Venable.(Roberts, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
54 54 2 pgs ORDER granting52 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (1). IT IS ORDERED that the deadline to indict the defendant in this matter is hereby extended to March 18, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/5/2021. (dest, ) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
55 55 ORDER granting53 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indictment as to Taurean Alphonso Venable (2). IT IS ORDERED that the deadline to indict the defendant in this matter is hereby extended to March 18, 2021. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/5/2021. (dest, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
56 56 1 pgs Reply to Motion by Ericka Sheree Oliver re52 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict (Miller, Marvin) [1:21-mj-00026-IDD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
57 57 ORDER that the39 Motion to Revoke Detention Order is DENIED as to Taurean Alphonso Venable (2). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 03/09/21. (pmil, ) [1:21-mj-00026-JFA-LO]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
Set Hearings as to Ericka Sheree Oliver, Taurean Alphonso Venable, Brandon Lorenzo Williams: Arraignment set for 3/24/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (dest, )
Related: [-]
58 58 12 pgs INDICTMENT as to Ericka Sheree Oliver (1) count(s) 1, Taurean Alphonso Venable (2) count(s) 1, Brandon Lorenzo Williams (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (dest, )
Related: [-]
61 61 3 pgs Redacted Criminal Case Cover Sheet (dest, )
Related: [-]