New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:21-cr-00103
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Mar 20, 2021 3:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard McGoey (1)
Represented By
Kerry Andrew Lawrence
Calhoun And Lawrence, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Margery Feinzig
United States District Court, Sdny ( White Plains)
contact info
James Franklin McMahon
Us Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/20/2021 4:01 AM EDT
Thursday, February 18, 2021
Case Designated ECF as to Richard McGoey. (lnl)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Initial Appearance as to Richard McGoey held on 2/18/2021. Defendant Richard McGoey present with attorney Kerry Lawrence Related [+]. AUSA: James McMahon and Margery Feinzig. Court Reporter: Pamela Grimaldi. (lnl)
Related: [-] tained
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Arraignment as to Richard McGoey (1) Count 1 held on 2/18/2021. Defendant Richard McGoey present with attorney Kerry Lawrence Related [+]. AUSA: James McMahon and Margery Feinzig. Court Reporter: Pamela Grimaldi. The defendant consented to proceed remotely. After executing a Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge in a Misdemeanor Case form, the defendant was advised of his rights and the charges against him, was arraigned on the Misdemeanor Information, waives public reading, and enters a guilty plea to Count 1 of the Misdemeanor Information. Sentencing is scheduled for May 27, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge McCarthy. Bail granted on consent of all counsel. (Sentencing set for 5/27/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy) Plea entered by Richard McGoey (1) Guilty as to Count 1. (lnl)
Related: [-] tained
1 1 INFORMATION (Misdemeanor) filed as to Richard McGoey (1) count(s) 1. (lnl)
Related: [-]
2 2 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN A MISDEMEANOR CASE ALLOCUTION by Richard McGoey. (lnl)
Related: [-]
3 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED BY VIDEO OR TELE CONFERENCE as to Richard McGoey. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/18/2021) (lnl)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Richard McGoey: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/18/2021) (lnl)
Related: [-]
5 5 PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND Entered as to Richard McGoey. (lnl)
Related: [-]