Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-00040
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Mar 21, 2021 2:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Trever Alan Bilyeu (1)
Represented By
Taylor McLawhorn
Federal Public Defender
contact info
John P Cannon
Cannon & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Jaymee Lynn Boucher (2)
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Wilson D McGarry
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/21/2021 3:00 AM CDT
Thursday, January 21, 2021
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Trever Alan Bilyeu (1). (rb) [5:21-mj-00038-P]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
3 3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by United States of America as to Trever Alan Bilyeu. (McGarry, Wilson) [5:21-mj-00038-P]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Trever Alan Bilyeu (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/27/2021. (cps) [5:21-mj-00038-P]
Related: [-]
5 5 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Trever Alan Bilyeu for March 1, 2021 at 3:00 pm. (cps) [5:21-mj-00038-P]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Trever Alan Bilyeu. Initial Appearance set for 3/1/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:21-mj-00038-P]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
7 7 SEALED INDICTMENT as to Trever Alan Bilyeu (1) count(s) 1, 2, Jaymee Lynn Boucher (2) count(s) 1, 2. (knt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Trever Alan Bilyeu,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet 2 - Jaymee Lynn Boucher