California Northern District Court
Judge:Sallie Kim
Case #: 3:21-cv-01985
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 18, 2021 2:09 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Sonoma
Represented By
Sheila D Crawford
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Lauren Elizabeth Wood
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Jucutan
Represented By
Sheila D Crawford
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Lauren Elizabeth Wood
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Defendant
Nikko Miller
Represented By
Sheila D Crawford
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Lauren Elizabeth Wood
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Anglero-Wyrick
Represented By
John Houston Scott
Scott Law Firm
contact info
Izaak David Schwaiger
Schwaiger Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Mark Essick
Terminated: 09/14/2021
Represented By
Richard William Osman
Bertrand, Fox, Elliot, Osman & Wenzel
contact info

GPO Sep 14 2021
ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, January 06, 2023
82 82 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 01/06 1:15 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 81 Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
81 81 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 01/03 3:55 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by County of Sonoma, Jeremy Jucutan, Nikko Miller. (Crawford, Sheila)
Related: [-]