Securities and Exchange Commission v. Wootten et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 18, 2021 1:30 AM MST |
Defendant
American Financial Security LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Family Tree Estate Planning LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ronald Frank Stevenson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason P Wootten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT- Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendants Ronald Frank Stevenson and American Financial Security, LLC (Doc.30 ) is granted. Defendants are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, the "Securities Act" and "Exchange Act" as discussed herein. Defendants are liable, jointly and severally, for disgorgement of $520,657, representing net profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $59,242 and/or a civil penalty in the amount of $125,000. Defendants shall satisfy this obligation by paying $704,899 to the Court-appointed Receiver, Burton Wiand, within 30 days after entry of this Final Judgment. This Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Judgment. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.25 ) is denied as moot. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/2023. (CLM) |
|
31 | 31
![]() FINAL JUDGMENT- Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Entry of Final Judgment as to Defendants Jason P. Wootten and Family Tree Estate Planning, LLC (Doc.30 ) is granted. Defendants are permanently restrained and enjoined from violating directly or indirectly, the "Securities Act" and "Exchange Act" as discussed herein. Defendants are liable, jointly and severally, for disgorgement of $1,105,054, representing net profits gained as a result of the conduct alleged in the Complaint, together with prejudgment interest thereon in the amount of $105,464 and/or a civil penalty in the amount of $150,000. Defendants shall satisfy this obligation by paying $1,360,518 to the Court-appointed Receiver, Burton Wiand, within 30 days after entry of this Final Judgment. This Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Judgment. See Order for further information. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/2023. (CLM) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Consent MOTION for Judgment [Final] by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Johnson, Alise) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
![]() ORDER: Granting the parties Joint Motion (Doc.28 ). This case is stayed for 45 days as of this date. The stay will be lifted 11/17/2022. If the parties have not submitted a Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by 11/17/2022, Defendants, Ronald Stevenson and American Financial Security LLC, shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.25 ) on or before 11/30/2022. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/3/2022. (CLM) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay Case for 45 Days to Allow SEC Commissioners to Consider Settlement with Defendants by American Financial Security LLC, Family Tree Estate Planning LLC, Ronald Frank Stevenson, Jason P Wootten. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ORDER denying24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay. FURTHER ORDERED affirming all deadlines and orders set forth in the August 6, 2021, Case Management Conference Order (Doc.15 ), as amended by the Court's May 13, 2022, Order (Doc.19 ) and as affirmed by the Court's August 10, 2022 (Doc.22 ) Order. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/2/2022. (KFZ) |
|
26 | 26
![]() STATEMENT OF FACTS re:25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff as for Liability and Non Monetary Relief against Defendants Ronald Stevenson and American Financial Security LLC and Memorandum of Law (Undisputed) by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission.(Johnson, Alise) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
25 | 25
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff as for Liability and Non Monetary Relief against Defendants Ronald Stevenson and American Financial Security LLC and Memorandum of Law by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION to Stay the Case for Sixty (60) Days to Allow SEC Commissioners to Consider Settlement with Defendants Jason P. Wootten and Family Tree Estate Planning LLC (Unopposed) and Notice of Settlement with these Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Johnson, Alise) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal of Zachary R. Cormier filed by Robert D Mitchell. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER denying Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion21 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming all deadlines and orders set forth in the August 6, 2021, Case Management Conference Order15 , as amended by the Court's May 13, 2022, Order19 . Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/10/2022. (REK) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions (Unopposed) from the current deadline of September 2, 2022 to October 17, 2022 by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Johnson, Alise) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions (Joint Report) by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) |
|
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting18 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines as set forth in the attached Order, including discovery due by 7/22/2022. FURTHER ORDERED all other orders set forth in the August 6, 2021 Case Management Order (Doc.15 ), except as modified herein, shall remain in full force and effect. There will be no further extension of these or any other deadlines contained in the Court's August 6, 2021 Case Management Order (Doc.15 ). See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/13/2022. (KFZ) |
|
18 | 18
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Pretrial Deadlines by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Johnson, Alise) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Family Tree Estate Planning LLC. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Financial Security LLC. (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 5/6/2022. Dispositive motions due by 9/2/2022. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/2021. (KFZ) |
|
14 | 14
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Fri 08/06 12:29 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Judge G Murray Snow: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2021. Deadlines discussed and entered. Order to follow. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Alise Johnson for Plaintiff. Robert Mitchell for Defendants. (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:31 AM to 10:37 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ) |
|
Monday, August 02, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE re: Defendants' Initial Disclosure by American Financial Security LLC, Family Tree Estate Planning LLC, Ronald Frank Stevenson, Jason P Wootten . (Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 30, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE re: of Initial Disclosure by Securities and Exchange Commission re:10 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Johnson, Alise) |
|
11 | 11
![]() REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) |
|
Wednesday, May 26, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for August 6, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall set up a call- in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/26/2021. (WLP) |
|
Monday, May 24, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by American Financial Security LLC, Family Tree Estate Planning LLC, Ronald Frank Stevenson, Jason P Wootten.(Mitchell, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 29, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Securities and Exchange Commission: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 03/23/2021 to Ronald Frank Stevenson . (Johnson, Alise) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Securities and Exchange Commission: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 03/23/2021 to Jason P. Wootten . (Johnson, Alise) |
|
6 | 6
![]() SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Securities and Exchange Commission: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 03/23/2021 to Family Tree Estate Planning LLC . (Johnson, Alise) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Securities and Exchange Commission: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 03/23/2021 to American Financial Security, LLC . (Johnson, Alise) |
|
Monday, March 22, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to American Financial Security LLC, Family Tree Estate Planning LLC, Ronald Frank Stevenson, Jason P Wootten.(BAC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 21-00482 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) |
|
2 | 2
![]() SUMMONS Submitted by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise) (BAC) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Johnson, Alise)(BAC) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |