Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael J Mcshane
Case #: 6:21-cv-00450
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:405 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2021
Terminated:Jul 30, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Sep 19, 2021 3:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Bell Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Daly
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett, PLLC
contact info
Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Preg, O'Donnell & Gillett
contact info
Defendant
Pinewood Properties, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Daly
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett, PLLC
contact info
Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Preg, O'Donnell & Gillett
contact info
Defendant
Richard Sorric
Represented By
Jeffrey W. Daly
Preg O'Donnell & Gillett, PLLC
contact info
Anna Elizabeth Esfeld
Preg, O'Donnell & Gillett
contact info
Plaintiff
N.H.
Represented By
Meredith A. Holley
Law Office Of Meredith Holley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, July 30, 2021
17 17 order Judgment - Terminate Case Fri 07/30 4:24 PM
STIPULATED GENERAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL: . Signed on 7/30/2021 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 21, 2021
16 16 oth_doc Proposed Order or Judgment Wed 07/21 9:00 AM
Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted re Dismissal . Filed by Bell Real Estate, Inc., Pinewood Properties, LLC, Richard Sorric. (Daly, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 15, 2021
15 15 oth_doc Status Report Thu 07/15 4:28 PM
Joint Status Report by N.H.. Filed by N.H.. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
14 14 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 06/15 10:36 AM
Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Based upon the request of the parties, the 6/16/2021 Rule 16 Conference is vacated. The parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 7/15/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
13 13 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 06/08 2:16 PM
Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Rule 16 Conference is set for 6/16/2021 at 09:15AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The Court will provide the parties with the conference call-in number by separate email. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/13 2:30 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, . Filed by Richard Sorric. (Daly, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/10 5:23 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Pinewood Properties, LLC. (Daly, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Defendant Pinewood Properties, LLC.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/10 5:18 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Bell Real Estate, Inc.. (Daly, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Defendant Bell Real Estate, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thursday, April 29, 2021
9 9 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/29 12:11 PM
Certificate of Service by N.H. Filed by N.H.. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
8 8 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Fri 04/16 2:05 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Pinewood Properties, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due on 5/3/2021. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Fri 04/16 2:04 PM
Return of Service Executed as to Bell Real Estate, Inc. served on 4/12/2021, answer due on 5/3/2021. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 06, 2021
6 6 oth_doc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/06 1:41 PM
Amended Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint,1 . Filed by N.H.. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/24 5:07 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Sorric. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/24 5:04 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Pinewood Properties, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 03/24 5:01 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Bell Real Estate, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (bd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 03/24 4:18 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/22/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/23/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/23/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (bd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/23 4:59 PM
First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8005418 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by NH against Bell Real Estate, Inc., Pinewood Properties, LLC, Richard Sorric. (Holley, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons