Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-00082
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 24, 2021 3:32 AM AST
Defendant
Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1)
Defendant
Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6)
Defendant
Joseph Kirkland (5)
Defendant
Stephen Kirkland (2)
Defendant
Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7)
Defendant
Steve Minger (3)
Defendant
Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4)
Interested Party
US Probation Officer
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Myriam Y. Fernandez-Gonzalez
United States Attorneys Office
contact info

GPO Apr 26 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 5/10/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 4/26/2024. (CSV)
GPO Jul 29 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 8/12/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 7/29/2024. (CSV)
GPO Aug 27 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Amendment 821 as to Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6): Defendant is not eligible. Objections to R&R due by 9/10/2024. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 8/27/2024. (CSV)

Docket last updated: 02/16/2024 8:03 PM AST
Monday, March 22, 2021
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1), Stephen Kirkland (2), Steve Minger (3), Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4), Joseph Kirkland (5), Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6), Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7). (idg)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1), Stephen Kirkland (2), Steve Minger (3), Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4), Joseph Kirkland (5), Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6), Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler on 3/22/2021. (idg)
Related: [-]
3 3 INDICTMENT as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1) count(s) 1, 2-18, 19-23, Stephen Kirkland (2) count(s) 1, 4, 12-13, 15, 24-27, Steve Minger (3) count(s) 1, 4-17, 25, 28, Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4) count(s) 1, 6, 16, 29, Joseph Kirkland (5) count(s) 1, 2-18, Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6) count(s) 1, 7, 17, 30, Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7) count(s) 1, 2-18, 19-33. (idg) (idg). Modified on 3/23/2021 to unseal (rom).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/22/2021) NPV
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1), Stephen Kirkland (2), Steve Minger (3), Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4), Joseph Kirkland (5), Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6), Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7) held on 3/22/2021. Arraignment to be set upon arrest. Arrest warrants to be issued.(Court Reporter DCR.) (idg)
Related: [-]
5 5 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Giselle Lopez-Soler in case as to Eugenio Garcia-Jimenez (1), Stephen Kirkland (2), Steve Minger (3), Alejandro Riera-Fernandez (4), Joseph Kirkland (5), Arnaldo J. Irizarry-Irizarry (6), Roberto Mejill-Tellado (7). (idg)
Related: [-]