Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy Beetlestone
Case #: 2:21-cv-01397
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2021
Terminated:Mar 09, 2022
Last checked: Monday Sep 20, 2021 6:15 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM BRANDT
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
TROY DANIELS
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL PLISAK
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
VACHO SHAHEN
Represented By
VAZKEN ZEROUNIAN
Haggerty, Goldberg, Schleifer & Kupersmith, P.C.
contact info
ALAN E. DENENBERG
Abramson & Denenberg
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
WARDEN SEAN MARLER
Terminated: 06/29/2021
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
ASSOCIATE WARDEN PETE LAWRIE
Terminated: 06/29/2021
Represented By
JOEL M. SWEET
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 09 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/8/22. 3/9/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Mar 09 2022
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ALTERNATIVELY TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/8/22. 3/9/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 25, 2022
45 45 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Fri 03/25 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by VAZKEN ZEROUNIAN on behalf of VACHO SHAHEN(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 09, 2022
44 44 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 03/09 2:50 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ALTERNATIVELY TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/8/22. 3/9/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
43 43 10 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 03/09 2:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 3/8/22. 3/9/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 01/24 1:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Alternatively to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK. (SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/20 1:35 PM
ORDER DENIED35 MOTION TO STAY BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 01/20/2022.01/20/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/20 1:38 PM
ORDER DENIED36 MOTION TO STAY BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 01/20/2022.01/20/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
39 39 respm Response to Motion Wed 01/19 4:24 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re35 First MOTION to Stay filed by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK.(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Sunday, January 16, 2022
38 38 trial Exhibit Tue 01/18 9:36 AM
EXHIBIT, re:37 by VACHO SHAHEN. (FILED UNDER SEAL). (fb) (fb)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Statement Sun 01/16 4:47 PM
Statement of Disputed Facts by VACHO SHAHEN.(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
36 36 motion Stay Sun 01/16 3:04 PM
MOTION to Stay re35 First MOTION to Stay filed by VACHO SHAHEN..(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Stay Sun 01/16 2:55 PM
First MOTION to Stay filed by VACHO SHAHEN.memorandum, Certificate of Service.(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
34 34 misc Statement Tue 01/11 1:19 PM
Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of their motion for summary judgment by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK. (SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/11 11:22 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR FAILURE TO FOLLOW COURT'S PROCEDURES IS DENIED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 1/26/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/11/22. 1/11/22 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/10 2:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Strike and Request for Leave to File a Statement of Undsiputed Facts filed by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK.(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Statement of Undisputed Facts
Friday, January 07, 2022
31 31 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/07 12:19 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VACHO SHAHEN re29 Response to Motion (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Strike Fri 01/07 12:17 AM
MOTION to Strike filed by VACHO SHAHEN..(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 06, 2022
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/06 11:57 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Alternatively to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by VACHO SHAHEN. (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
28 28 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/23 2:51 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ALTERNATIVELY TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 1/6/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/23/21. 12/23/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 12/20 2:09 PM
ORDER DENIED26 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE26 MOTION for Reconsideration re25 Order filed by VACHO SHAHEN BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/20/2021.12/20/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
26 26 motion Reconsideration Fri 12/17 5:06 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re25 Order filed by VACHO SHAHEN..(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, December 16, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/16 4:15 PM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS STRICKEN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 12/14/2021. 12/16/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
service Summons Issued Tue 12/14 11:11 AM
Summons as to second amended complaint Issued as to WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, TIMOTHY G FRONTINO, MICHAEL PLISAK. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/14/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
24 24 trial Exhibit Tue 12/14 8:51 AM
EXHIBITS Filed Under Seal to23 Second Amended Complaint by VACHO SHAHEN. **(FILED UNDER SEAL)**(tjd) (tjd, )
Related: [-]
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/13 4:41 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, JOHN DOE(FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON EMPLOYEES 1 - 96), JOHN DOE(CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS 1 - 96), MICHAEL PLISAK, TIMOTHY G FRONTINO, filed by VACHO SHAHEN.(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's IROGs
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/23 3:01 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Alternatively to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit Joint Appendix,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 25, 2021
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/25 1:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mubashshir re: served Summons upon AUSA Joel Sweet by personal on 9/09/2021 (DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 10/14 3:44 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEFAULT IS STRICKEN; AND DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN 45 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 10/14/21.10/14/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 08, 2021
19 19 motion Strike Fri 10/08 4:34 PM
MOTION to Strike18 MOTION for Entry of Default & Set Date for Defendants to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
Friday, September 17, 2021
18 18 motion Entry of Default Fri 09/17 1:36 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by VACHO SHAHEN..(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 24, 2021
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/24 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK with Certificate of Service(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Tue 07/27 6:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Postal Service re: served Amended Complaint upon Honorable Merrick B. Garland by Certified Mail on 07/09/2021 (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 01, 2021
service Summons Issued Thu 07/01 9:43 AM
AMENDED Summons Issued as to WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/1/21 (JL )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/30 2:39 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE(FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISON EMPLOYEES 1 - 99), JOHN DOE(CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS 1 - 99), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, WILLIAM BRANDT, TROY DANIELS, MICHAEL PLISAK, filed by VACHO SHAHEN.(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 06/29 4:51 PM
STIPUALTION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 7/2/21. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 7/27/21. PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES DEFENDANTS SEAN MARLER AND PETE LAWRIE FROM THE ABOVE CAPTIONED ACTION WITH PREJUDICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/29/21. 6/29/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 25, 2021
13 13 order Protective Order Fri 06/25 1:36 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH COURT APPROVAL RE: CERTAIN STATEMENTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/25/21. 6/25/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/25/2021) (jl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2021
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/22 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VACHO SHAHEN re: Stuart Doctorovitz served Summons and Complaint upon PETE LAWRIE, SEAN MARLER by Personal Service upon person authorized to accept. (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 09, 2021
11 11 motion Appear Wed 06/09 5:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by VACHO SHAHEN..(DENENBERG, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/27 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VACHO SHAHEN re: Vazken Zerounian, Esquire served Summons and Complaint upon UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by CERTIFIED MAIL. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/27 2:22 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VACHO SHAHEN re: Vazken Zerounian, Esquire served Summons and Complaint upon JOHN DOE(CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS 1 - 99) by Certified Mail. JOHN DOE(CORRECTIONAL OFFICERS 1 - 99) served on 5/24/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
8 8 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 05/25 3:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE Pretrial/RULE 16 Conference held on 5/11/21. (JL )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
7 7 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 05/13 11:22 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD LLORET FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/8/21. ANY MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 2/3/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/11/21. 5/13/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/05 8:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of PETE LAWRIE, SEAN MARLER with Certificate of Service(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
5 5 misc Report Of Tue 05/04 9:37 PM
Report Of Joint Rule 26(f) by VACHO SHAHEN. (ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 04/26 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO HEARING:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/11/2021 03:00 PM VIA ZOOM VIDEO, THE PARTIES SHALL CONFER AS TO WHO WILL SCHEDULE AND CIRCULATE ZOOM INFORMATION TO CHAMBERS AT chambers_of_judge_beetlestone@paed.uscourts.gov BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.(amw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER,
Att: 2 JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26 F
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/21 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOEL M. SWEET on behalf of PETE LAWRIE, SEAN MARLER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Certificate of Service(SWEET, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
2 2 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Thu 04/01 8:30 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 03/24 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against SEAN MARLER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, PETE LAWRIE, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15005164.), filed by VACHO SHAHEN.(ZEROUNIAN, VAZKEN) Modified on 3/24/2021 (fb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Track Form
misc Jury Demand Wed 03/24 11:30 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by VACHO SHAHEN. (fb)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 03/24 12:05 PM
Summons Issued as to PETE LAWRIE, SEAN MARLER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/24/21. SUMMONS E-MAILED TO AUSA ON 3/24/21. (bw, )
Related: [-]