Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-30606

North Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shon Hastings
Case #: 3:21-ap-07007
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2021
Terminated:Aug 03, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C.
2 North Riverside Plz, Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60606
Represented By
MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Dawn Hettervig
1825 6th St W
West Fargo, ND 58078
Represented By
Steven J. Simonson
Legal Services Of North Dakota
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/03 8:48 AM
Adversary Case 3:21-ap-7007 Closed (Default Judgment for Plaintiff against Defendant). (mjk, Court)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 19, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/19 10:40 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Dawn Hettervig Related [+]. (Simonson, Steven)
Related: [-] 13 Default Judgment
Sunday, July 18, 2021
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Default Judgment
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 07/18 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, July 16, 2021
13 13 order Default Judgment Fri 07/16 2:52 PM
Default Judgment. Based on the Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment, IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of the Plaintiff and against Defendant MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C. in the sum of $850.00. Signed on 7/16/2021. (mjk, Court)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Default Judgment Fri 07/16 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Plaintiff is granted default judgment against Defendant MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C. in the sum of$850.00. Signed on 7/16/2021. (mjk, Court)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, June 21, 2021
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/21 11:28 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Dawn Hettervig Related [+]. (Simonson, Steven)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Including: Notice of Motion served on 6/18/2021,10 Document
10 10 misc Document Mon 06/21 11:27 AM
Document Statement of Counsel for Debtor Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Dawn Hettervig Related [+]. (Simonson, Steven)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Including: Notice of Motion served on 6/18/2021
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 06/21 11:25 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Including: Notice of Motion served on 6/18/2021 Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Dawn Hettervig Last day to object is 07/9/2021. (Simonson, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
8 8 misc Correspondence Mon 06/14 2:40 PM
Correspondence directed to Attorney Simonson Re: Request for Status Report Related [+] (vck, Court)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Saturday, May 01, 2021
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/01 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, April 29, 2021
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/29 11:12 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+]. (mjk, Court)
Related: [-] 2 Complaint
Monday, March 29, 2021
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/29 4:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C. 3/29/2021 (Simonson, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/29 3:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on CT Corporation System, Attorney Gregory Thompson 3/25/2021 (Simonson, Steven) (enhanced docket; requested service on Defendant MHC Buena Vista, LLC) Modified on 3/29/2021 (mjk, Court)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 03/23 2:47 PM
Summons Issued on MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C. Date Issued 3/23/2021, Answer Due 4/22/2021 (vck, Court)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/23 1:42 PM
Complaint by Steven J. Simonson on behalf of Kristin Dawn Hettervig against MHC Buena Vista, L.L.C. Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Kristin Dawn Hettervig). (Simonson, Steven) (corrected docket) Modified on 3/23/2021 (vck, Court)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/23 1:09 PM
Adversary case 21-07007 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet ( SEE # 2 Complaint) by Kristin Dawn Hettervig against MHC Buena Vista LLC. Receipt Number Exempt,. (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Simonson, Steven) (enhanced docket) Modified on 3/23/2021 (vck, Court)
Related: [-]