Oregon District Court
Judge:Thomas M Coffin
Case #: 6:14-cv-01035
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2014
Terminated:Jan 26, 2015
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 12:39 PM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
John Hawkins
Represented By
Seth T. Karpinski
State Of Oregon
contact info
David F. Taglienti
State Of California, Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Vicki Hightower
Represented By
John S. Poulos
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Arthur K. Cunningham
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Riverside County
Represented By
John S. Poulos
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Arthur K. Cunningham
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paul Zellerbach
Represented By
Arthur K. Cunningham
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel J. Tanner
an individual 36366 Valley Road
Pleasant Hill, OR 97455
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Amy Zeta
Terminated: 08/14/2014
Represented By
John S. Poulos
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Arthur K. Cunningham
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 31 2015
Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiffs motion 34 to supplement his response to the motions to dismiss is allowed and the supplemental responses are received and have been reviewed. Plaintiffs motion 29 for the court to make a correction to count three of the amended complaint through interlineation is denied as immaterial. Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint26 and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike27 should be allowed to the extent this action should be transferred to the Central District of California. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 1/20/2015. Signed on 12/31/14 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (kf)
GPO Jan 23 2015
ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation 35. This action is transferred to the Central District of California. See formal order. Copy of order sent to Pro Se Plaintiff. Signed on 1/23/2015 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 29, 2015
transfer Case Electronically Transferred Out to Another District Fri 01/30 8:50 AM
Case electronically transferred out to the Central District of California. Other Court Case Number 5:15-cv-00183 assigned. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2015
38 38 order Order on Findings & Recommendation Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 01/26 2:32 PM
ORDER: Adopting Findings and Recommendation35 . This action is transferred to the Central District of California. See formal order. Copy of order sent to Pro Se Plaintiff. Signed on 1/23/2015 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 31, 2014
37 37 service Clerks Notice of Mailing Wed 12/31 2:38 PM
Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Tanner of Findings & Recommendation35 and Findings & Recommendation Referred 36 . (kf)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Findings & Recommendation Referred Wed 12/31 2:34 PM
Order referring Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 26 , Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike 27 & Findings & Recommendation35 to Judge Aiken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (kf)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Findings & Recommendation Wed 12/31 2:22 PM
Findings & Recommendation: Plaintiffs motion34 to supplement his response to the motions to dismiss is allowed and the supplemental responses are received and have been reviewed. Plaintiffs motion29 for the court to make a correction to count three of the amended complaint through interlineation is denied as immaterial. Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 26 and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike 27 should be allowed to the extent this action should be transferred to the Central District of California. Objections to the Findings and Recommendation are due by 1/20/2015. Signed on 12/31/14 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (kf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 10, 2014
34 34 Motion/Request to Supplement Response to Motions to Dismiss and or Transfer by Addition of Exhibit B Attached Hereto. Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 09, 2014
33 33 Reply of Defendant John Hawkins to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike 27 . Filed by John Hawkins. (Taglienti, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 02, 2014
32 32 Reply to plaintiff's opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 26 . Filed by Vicki Hightower, Riverside County, Paul Zellerbach. (Cunningham, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 25, 2014
31 31 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 26 . Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
30 30 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike 27 . Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb) (ljb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (9/26/2014) Exhibit
Tuesday, September 23, 2014
29 29 Motion to Amend/Correct Count Three of the Amended Complaint11 Through Interlineation. Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 19, 2014
28 28 Declaration of John Hawkins in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike . Filed by John Hawkins. Related [+] (Taglienti, David)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss27 .
27 27 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike . Filed by John Hawkins. (Taglienti, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
26 26 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Filed by Riverside County, Paul Zellerbach, Vicki Hightower. (Cunningham, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Notice of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Proposed Document Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, September 10, 2014
25 25 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Daniel J. Tanner regarding Order on motion for extension of time 24 . (plb)
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time20 . Defendant John Hawkins's Answer is due by 9/19/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
23 23 Notification of CM/ECF Account: Attorney David F. Taglienti (appearing Pro Hac Vice ). Login ID: dftaglienti . Complete your account setup by following the instructions available on the[LINK:Court's website] . (ljb)
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David F. Taglienti for John Hawkins. (fee waived as State govt attorney) Signed on 9/8/14 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
Related: [-]
21 21 Declaration of David F. Taglienti in Support of Defendant John Hawkins' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint . Filed by John Hawkins. Related [+] (Karpinski, Seth)
Related: [-] Amended Complaint,11 , Motion for Extension of Time20 .
20 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof; Declaration of David F. Taglienti . Filed by John Hawkins. (Karpinski, Seth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 04, 2014
19 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David F. Taglienti . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Receipt No.: Government. Filed by John Hawkins. (Karpinski, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 02, 2014
18 18 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Daniel J. Tanner regarding Scheduling 17 . (plb)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER: The parties' Stipulation to Extend Time16 is construed as a motion for an extension of time to answer the Amended Complaint11 and is granted. Defendants Vicki Hightower, Riverside County and Paul Zellerbach's answers are due by 9/19/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 29, 2014
16 16 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants Hightower, Zellerbach and County of Riverside to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Vicki Hightower, Riverside County, Paul Zellerbach. Filed by Vicki Hightower, Riverside County, Paul Zellerbach. (Cunningham, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit 1
Monday, August 25, 2014
15 15 Summons Returned Executed as to John Hawkins served on 8/18/2014, answer due on 9/8/2014. (no case cover page) Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
14 14 Summons Returned Executed as to Paul Zellerbach served on 8/18/2014, answer due on 9/8/2014. (no case cover page) Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 20, 2014
13 13 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Daniel J. Tanner regarding Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction 10 . (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 14, 2014
12 12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction 9 . Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
11 11 Amended Complaint Summons issued as to Defendants Paul Zellerbach and John Hawkins. Filed by Daniel J. Tanner against Does 1 through 10, Vicki Hightower, Riverside County of California, Paul Zellerbach, John Hawkins. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Defendant Hawkins,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Defendant Zellerbach
Wednesday, August 13, 2014
10 10 ORDER: Plaintiff has attempted to file a First Amended Complaint without leave of court. Due to plaintiff's pro se status and the posture of this case, the First Amended Complaint is deemed a motion to amend and is granted. The Clerk shall file such First Amended Complaint and it is deemed the operative pleading in this action. Defendant's motion [#9] of notice of motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice to file against the First Amended Complaint. by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 08, 2014
9 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Filed by Riverside County of California, Amy Zeta, Vicki Hightower. (Cunningham, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Attachment Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Attachment Declaration of Amy Zeta in Support,
Att: 4 Attachment Declaration of Vicki Hightower in Support,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, August 01, 2014
8 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Arthur K. Cunningham for Vicki Hightower,Arthur K. Cunningham for Riverside County of California,Arthur K. Cunningham for Amy Zeta. Application Fee in amount of $100 collected. Receipt No. 0979-3777053 issued. Signed on 8/1/14 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
Related: [-]
7 7 Notification of CM/ECF Account: Attorney Arthur K. Cunningham (appearing Pro Hac Vice ). Login ID: akcunningham . Complete your account setup by following the instructions available on the[LINK:Court's website] . (ljb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 30, 2014
6 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arthur K. Cunningham . Filing fee in the amount of $100 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3777053. Filed by Vicki Hightower, Riverside County of California, Amy Zeta. (Poulos, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 28, 2014
5 5 Certificate of Service of Complaint1 upon Oregon Attorney General on 7/23/14 by Daniel J. Tanner. Filed by Daniel J. Tanner. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 30, 2014
4 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Daniel J. Tanner regarding Discovery order3 . (ljb)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/28/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 11/28/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 27, 2014
2 2 Summons Issued as to Vicki Hightower, Riverside County of California, Amy Zeta. (ljb)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Receipt No. ORX600009076.Summons issued as to defendants Hightower, Zeta and County of Riverside California. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Daniel J. Tanner against Does 1 through 10, Vicki Hightower, Riverside County of California, Amy Zeta. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet