Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 2:21-cv-00370
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2021
Re-opened:Sep 17, 2021
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 11, 2023
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Mon 12/11 9:51 AM
Case Dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (mac)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
67 67 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 12/08 3:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Demetrius Gohre. (White, Hunter)
Related: [-]