Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-00092
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Terminated:Sep 29, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Mar 25, 2021 2:42 AM CDT
Defendant
James Damien McIntosh (1)
Represented By
Marna Swanda Franklin
Franklin Atty At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sandra Marie Urban
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/05/2021 2:43 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary by USA as to James Damien McIntosh (1) (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
2 2 WARRANT Issued by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary as to James Damien McIntosh (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
3 3 3 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to James Damien McIntosh (Urban, Sandra) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to James Damien McIntosh (Urban, Sandra) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-] 3 MOTION for Detention
5 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (CJA) by Marna Swanda Franklin on behalf of James Damien McIntosh [Note: Attorney Marna Swanda Franklin added to party James Damien McIntosh(pty:dft).] (Franklin, Marna) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs WAIVER of Personal appearance by James Damien McIntosh (Franklin, Marna) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary: Initial Appearance held on 3/19/2021 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #3 moot, #4 moot, appointing CJA attorney Marna Swanda Franklin for James Damien McIntosh, ordering defendant be detained as to James Damien McIntosh Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-] 4 MOTION for Hearing ,3 MOTION for Detention
8 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary , appointing CJA attorney as to James Damien McIntosh (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by James Damien McIntosh (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs WAIVER of Detention Hearing and CONSENT to Order of Detention Pending Further Proceedings; ORDER of Detention approved by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary by James Damien McIntosh (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary re: Brady as to James Damien McIntosh (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:21-mj-00199-PJC]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
12 12 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to James Damien McIntosh (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs INDICTMENT by USA as to James Damien McIntosh (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #13 per Local Rule 5.3(b) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]