Washington Western District Court
Case #: 3:21-mj-05064
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Mar 25, 2021 12:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Alyssa Erin Gilchrist (1)
Represented By
Jerome Kuh
Federal Public Defender'S Office (tac)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory A Gruber
Us Attorney'S Office (tacoma)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/25/2021 1:11 AM PDT
Monday, March 22, 2021
Arrest of Alyssa Erin Gilchrist on 3/22/2021. (TW)
Related: [-]
1 1 CHARGING DOCUMENT RECEIVED FROM DISTRICT OF UTAH as to Alyssa Erin Gilchrist (TW)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Jerome Kuh for Alyssa Erin Gilchrist. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that he/she is financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (No.pdf image attached) (TW)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Alyssa Erin Gilchrist (TW)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Theresa L Fricke- CRD: Traci Whiteley ; AUSA: Greg Gruber ; Def Cnsl: Jerome Kuh ; PTS: Leona Nguyen ; Time of Hearing: 2:30pm ; Courtroom: Video/Audio Conference ; Session #: Zoom Recording ; INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) PROCEEDINGS as to Alyssa Erin Gilchrist held on 3/22/2021. Defendant present in custody at the Tacoma courthouse and consents to proceed by video conference. Financial affidavit reviewed, counsel appointed. Defendant advised of rights and charges. Court accepts Defendant's Waiver of Rule 5 Hearings and Court signs Order of Transfer. Defense asks for detention hearing. Defendant remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 3/25/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Theresa L Fricke via Zoom. (TW)
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/22/2021 in case as to Alyssa Erin Gilchrist. (TW)
Related: [-]