Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Referred: Paul R Cherry
Case #: 4:14-cv-00057
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2014
Terminated:Aug 04, 2015
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 9:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA
Represented By
Brent D Taylor
Faegre Baker Daniels Llp - Ind/in/mer
contact info
Plaintiff
Clint Slinker, Jr
Represented By
Michael A Eades
John Steinkamp & Associates
contact info
John T Steinkamp
John Steinkamp & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Clint Slinker, Sr
Represented By
Michael A Eades
John Steinkamp & Associates
contact info
John T Steinkamp
John Steinkamp & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 04, 2015
utility Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1 Tue 08/04 2:07 PM
CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the25 joint stipulation. (saj)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 03, 2015
25 25 motion Dismiss Mon 08/03 3:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Clint Slinker, Jr, Clint Slinker, Sr. (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 07/02 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER re23 Notice of Settlement filed by Clint Slinker, Jr, Clint Slinker, Sr. (Dismissal Papers due by 8/3/2015.) Text entry. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 7/2/2015. (smb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 07/01 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by All Plaintiffs(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Proposed Order
Thursday, January 15, 2015
22 22 minutes Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/15 12:35 PM
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/15/2015 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by attys John Steinkamp, Michael Eades. Dft appeared by atty Brent Taylor. Discovery schedule discussed and modified. Discovery deadline extended to 10/15/2015. Expert Discovery deadline extended to 10/15/2015. #FTR.) (smb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 12, 2015
21 21 notice Notice - Other Mon 01/12 4:46 PM
NOTICE by Clint Slinker, Jr, Clint Slinker, Sr of Service of Initial Disclosures (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing/Deadlines Mon 01/12 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Hearing regarding 19 : Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/15/2015 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry for the purpose of clarifying the discovery schedule. The Court will initiate the conference. (smb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 09, 2014
19 19 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held by teleph 10/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by attys John Steinkamp, Michael Eades. Dft appeared by atty Brent Taylor. All dates/ddl through close of discovery in Joint Report18 are approved, adopted, and incorporated herein. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 11/26/2014. Discovery deadline is 3/4/2015. Expert Discovery deadline is 4/6/2015 Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 7/30/2015. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 8/28/2015. Rule 26(e) supplemental expert reports due by 8/28/2015. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/26/2014. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 10/30/2014. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply in this case. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. ( #FTR.) (smb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 03, 2014
18 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 18, 2014
17 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA.(Taylor, Brent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
16 16 MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer nunc pro tunc. Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA answer due 9/15/2014. Text entry/no pdf order to be issued. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/16/2014. (smb)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER striking14 Answer to Complaint filed by Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA, with leave to re-file a document that complies with the Local Rules on or before 9/23/14; Corrected pleadings to be filed by 9/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/16/14. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
14 14 (STRICKEN PER ORDER OF 9/16/14) ANSWER to Complaint by Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA.(Taylor, Brent) Modified on 9/16/2014 to edit text (mlc).
Related: [-]
13 13 STATUS REPORT (Rule 26(f) Parties' Joint Initial Status Report) by Clint Slinker, Jr, Clint Slinker, Sr. (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 11, 2014
12 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Defendant Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA. (Taylor, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 28, 2014
11 11 MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA answer due 9/11/2014. Text entry. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/28/2014. (smb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
10 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint by Defendant Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA. (Taylor, Brent)
Related: [-]
9 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/17/2014. (smb)
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE of Hearing/Deadlines: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2014 09:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry w/the Court initiating the conference. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 10/3/2014. (smb)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Discovery Plan due by 10/3/2014. (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 19, 2014
7 7 NOTICE for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, (Initial, Automatic 28-Day Extension Of Time) by Defendant Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA. (Taylor, Brent) Answer due 8/28/2014. Modified on 8/21/2014 to reflect notice and not motion (smb).
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent D Taylor on behalf of Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA (Taylor, Brent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 17, 2014
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clint Slinker, Jr, Clint Slinker, Sr. Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA served on 7/10/2014, answer due 7/31/2014.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit
Tuesday, July 01, 2014
4 4 Summons Issued as to Weltman Weinberg & Reis Co LPA. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 30, 2014
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Eades on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eades, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Steinkamp on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against WELTMAN, WEINBERG & REIS CO., LPA( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-2390851.), filed by CLINT SLINKER, JR.,, CLINT SLINKER, SR.,.(Steinkamp, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1:Collector Information,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Small Claims Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3:Plaintiff's Affidavit,
Att: 4 Exhibit A: Letter referenced in Exhibit "3",
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
Related: [-]