Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02738

New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:21-cv-06801
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Sep 23, 2021 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
THOMAS GILFORD
Represented By
WILLIAM WYLIE BLAIR
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 16, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/16 8:48 AM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (lm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/26 3:14 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (km)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/26 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12307347) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THOMAS GILFORD.(BLAIR, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
mdl MDL Direct File Fri 03/26 3:10 PM
Member Case Direct File on 3/26/2021, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (km)
Related: [-]