Brinker v. Normandin's
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Referred: | Howard R Lloyd |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-03007 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:227 Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2014 |
Re-opened: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 1:38 PM PDT |
Cross-claimant
Normandin's
|
Represented By
|
Cross-defendant
Onecommand, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Normandin's
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Onecommand, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Brinker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
180 | 180
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 04/04 12:26 PM
FINAL APPROVAL ORDER OF JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Service Awards; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/4/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
179 | 179
minutes
Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 03/29 11:31 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re 172 Motion for Attorney Fees Costs and Service Awards , 177 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement held on 3/29/2018. The Court finds the settlement is fair, adequate and reasonable. The Court will grant the relief requested. The Court will grant attorneys fees. The Court will approve the final settlement. Court to issue order. Plaintiff Attorney: Adrienne McEntee. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Stearns, Sean Flynn.Total Time in Court:10:21-11:07am(46 Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2018) |