Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-23907

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:21-ap-01217
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2021
Terminated:May 12, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eric Mitchell Hirsch
3316 Park Place Springfiled
Springfiled, NJ 07081
Represented By
Eric Mitchell Hirsch
contact info
Plaintiff
Itria Ventures LLC
Itria Ventures LLC One Penn Plaza, Suite 4530
New York, NY 10119
Represented By
Mitchell B. Seidman
Seidman & Pincus LLC
contact info
Maria Arnott
Seidman &pincus, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, May 13, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 05/14 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/13/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
utility Close Adversary Case Wed 05/12 2:26 PM
Adversary Case (2:21-ap-1217) Closed. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
4 4 order Judgment Tue 05/11 4:16 PM
Consent Order and Judgment Determining the Debt to be Nondischargeable Related [+].. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/11/2021. (jf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Itria Ventures LLC
Thursday, April 01, 2021
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/01 1:45 PM
Certificate of Service. filed by Mitchell B. Seidman on behalf of Itria Ventures LLC. (Seidman, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 03/29 3:12 PM
Summons Issued to Itria Ventures LLC for Service on Eric Mitchell Hirsch Answer due on 4/28/2021 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 6/10/2021 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Friday, March 26, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/26 1:05 PM
Adversary case 21-01217 Complaint by Itria Ventures LLC against Eric Mitchell Hirsch. Fee Amount $ 350.. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Arnott, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Summons
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 03/26 1:08 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-01217 VFP] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A42339866, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1