New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:21-cv-06959
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Sep 23, 2021 5:49 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By
JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH JENKINS
Represented By
BERT TARRANT DUNKEN, Jr
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 06/04 10:10 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ELIZABETH JENKINS. (SHARMA, BHARATI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/16 12:09 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman and Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. (tf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
7 7 misc Substitution of Attorney Wed 10/26 12:30 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney BERT TARRANT DUNKEN, Jr terminated. Attorney BHARATI O. SHARMA for ELIZABETH JENKINS added.. (SHARMA, BHARATI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/19 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (BRENNAN, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/18 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/15 1:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/15 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/29 9:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg, )
Related: [-]
mdl MDL Direct File Mon 03/29 9:19 AM
Member Case Direct File on 3/26/2021, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (mg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/26 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12311314) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Elizabeth Jenkins.(DUNKEN, BERT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet