BLASSINGAME et al v. TRUMP
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-cv-00400
Lead case: 1:21-cv-00400
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00858 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 26, 2021 5:27 AM EDT |
Amicus
EVAN H. CAMINKER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER ACTION
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
JARED HOLT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
ANDREW KENT
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
SHELDON NAHMOD
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
DAPHNA RENAN
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
PETER M. SHANE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
1100 S. Ocean Blvd. The Mar-A-Lago Club
Palm Beach, FL 33480 |
Represented By
|
Movant
FLOYD ABRAMS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MARTHA MINOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LAURENCE H. TRIBE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES BLASSINGAME
404 Kings Farm Blvd., #1
Rockville, MD 20850 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIDNEY HEMBY
9608 Lexington Place
Waldorf, MD 20603 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
order
.Order
Mon 04/29 5:48 PM
ORDER. Having considered the parties' respective positions, the deadline for immunity-related discovery shall be September 11, 2024. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 29, 2024, and every 30 days thereafter, which updates the court on the progress of discovery. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/29/2024. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM, 1:21-cv-00586-APM, 1:21-cv-00858-APM, 1:21-cv-02265-APM, 1:22-cv-00010-APM, 1:22-cv-00011-APM, 1:22-cv-00034-APM, 1:23-cv-00038-APM (lcapm3) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Status Report
Fri 04/26 5:06 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM, 1:21-cv-00586-APM, 1:21-cv-00858-APM, 1:21-cv-02265-APM, 1:23-cv-00038-APM(Sellers, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Tue 04/23 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant Trump's (107) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order and for Defendant to Provide Plaintiffs with Description of Immunity Defense in case 1:21-cv-00400-APM. The parties' proposed protective order shall now be due on or before May 10, 2024, and Defendant's description of his immunity defense is now due to Plaintiffs on or before May 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/23/2024. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM, 1:21-cv-00586-APM, 1:21-cv-00858-APM, 1:21-cv-02265-APM, 1:23-cv-00038-APM (lcapm3) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
54 | 54
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 04/22 7:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and Provide Plaintiffs with Description of Immunity Defense by DONALD J. TRUMP.Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM, 1:21-cv-00586-APM, 1:21-cv-00858-APM, 1:21-cv-02265-APM, 1:23-cv-00038-APM(Warrington, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |