Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul Mannes
Case #: 0:91-bk-42718
Case Filed:Jun 05, 1991
Terminated:Sep 28, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Aug 04, 1994

Debtor
John Driggs
2700 Ashwood Drive
Capitol Heights, MD 20852
Represented By
Nelson C. Cohen
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt, 11
US Trustee - Greenbelt 6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770
Represented By
Gerard R. ^2Vetter
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
1416 1416 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/01 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 09/30/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1414 BNC Recreated Order/Notice
1415 1415 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 10/01 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 09/30/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1412 Order on Application for Compensation
Monday, September 28, 2015
1414 1414 utility BNC Recreated Order/Notice Mon 09/28 4:42 PM
Resend Order/Notice to BNC Related [+]. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1413 Order and Final Decree in Chapter 11 Case
1413 1413 order Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 09/28 4:34 PM
Order and Final Decree in Chapter 11 Case. (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-]
1412 1412 order Compensation Mon 09/28 12:09 PM
ORDER APPROVING SEVENTH INTERIM AND FINAL APPLICATION OF ERNST & YOUNG LLP FOR POSTCONFIRMATION COMPENSATION FOR ACCOUNTING, APPRAISAL AND CONSULTING SERVICES RENDERED TO THE PLAN COMMITTEE IN THE DRIGGS REORGANIZATION CASE FOR THE PERIOD FROM AND AFTER AUGUST 1, 199 Related [+]. Granting for Ernst & Young LLP, fees awarded: $80028.00, expenses awarded: $ (McKenna, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1409 Application for Compensation filed by Ernst & Young LLP