Original Case: 5:13-cv-04535

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-16264
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2014
Terminated:Nov 07, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 09, 2016 12:40 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
GREENPOINT MORTGAGE FUNDING, INC.
Represented By
Jonah S. Van Zandt
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.
Represented By
Jonah S. Van Zandt
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as trustee for GreenPoint Mortgage Funding
Represented By
Jonah S. Van Zandt
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CALIFORNIA RECONVEYANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Cara Lynne Finan
Keesal Young & Logan
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARIN CONVEYANCING CORP.
Represented By
Jonah S. Van Zandt
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MORTGAGE ELECTRONICS REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
Jonah S. Van Zandt
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By
Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Jan T. Chilton
Severson & Werson APC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
FAREED SEPEHRY-FARD
Represented By
Fareed Sepehry-Fard
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/09/2016 12:32 AM PST
Thursday, July 03, 2014
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Fareed Sepehry-Fard on 07/02/2014. Appellant Fareed Sepehry-Fard opening brief due 10/10/2014. Appellees California Reconveyance Company, Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., Marin Conveyancing Corp., Mortgage Electronics Registration Systems, Inc., ReconTrust Company, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association answering brief due 11/10/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9155392] (RT) [Entered: 07/03/2014 10:01 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Attorney Andrew A. Wood in 14-16264 substituted by Attorney Joseph W. Guzzetta in 14-16264 (Andrew Wood no longer with firm, Joseph Guzzetta not registered for ECF, request to register immediately sent on 7/3/2014) [9156599] (ASW) [Entered: 07/03/2014 03:41 PM]
Related: [-]