Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. LendingTree, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-01107 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LendingTree, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LendingTree, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
![]() So Ordered Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice signed on 8/5/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/05 1:53 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-1107 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() So Ordered Stipulation Referring Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Staying Adversary Proceeding signed on 5/11/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, May 10, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Referring Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Staying Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation and proposed order setting briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to compel arbitration Filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion to Compel /Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Litigation Pending the Outcome of That Arbitration filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC with hearing to be held on 6/30/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC). (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Response /Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants to Plaintiffs Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial filed by Christopher Lee Wilson on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Wilson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kelly G. Laudon signed on 4/6/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew C. Corcoran signed on 4/6/2021 (White, Greg) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kelly G. Laudon filed by Kelly G Laudon on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Laudon, Kelly) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew C. Corcoran filed by Matthew Corcoran on behalf of LendingTree, Inc., LendingTree, LLC. (Corcoran, Matthew) |
|
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/06 10:20 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01107 scc] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15252052. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 04/06 12:12 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-01107 scc] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15252620. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Pre-Trial Conference for a Removed Case with Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (SCC), (Porter, Minnie) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01107 Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 1:21-cv-2574 (KPF) from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. . Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Joseph Francis Pacelli, Christopher J Lucht, John B. Orenstein, Joshua Slocum, William A Maher, Adam M Bialek, James N. Lawlor, Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Pisarczyk, Gladys) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |
||
Att: 24
![]() |
||
Att: 25
![]() |
||
Att: 26
![]() |
||
Att: 27
![]() |
||
Att: 28
![]() |
||
Att: 29
![]() |
||
Att: 30
![]() |
||
Att: 31
![]() |
||
Att: 32
![]() |
||
Att: 33
![]() |
||
Att: 34
![]() |
||
Att: 35
![]() |
||
Att: 36
![]() |
||
Att: 37
![]() |
||
Att: 38
![]() |
||
Att: 39
![]() |
||
Att: 40
![]() |
||
Att: 41
![]() |
||
Att: 42
![]() |
||
Att: 43
![]() |
||
Att: 44
![]() |