Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Referred: Kathleen B Burke
Case #: 4:21-cv-00723
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2021
Terminated:Sep 17, 2021
Case in other court:Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, 2021 CV 00225
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 29, 2021 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Steward Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By
Vincent J. Tersigni
Jackson Lewis - Cleveland
contact info
Seth J. Robbins
Todd & Weld
contact info
Matthew N. Danese
Wickens Herzer Panza
contact info
Richard L. Hilbrich
Jackson Lewis
contact info
Jason M. Brown
Todd & Weld
contact info
Howard M. Cooper
Todd & Weld
contact info
Jonathan T. Hyman
Wickens Herzer Panza - Avon
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Adil Jaffer
Represented By
Frank T. George
Mccarthy, Lebit, Crystal & Liffman
contact info
John E. Moran
Mccarthy, Lebit, Crystal & Liffman
contact info
Ann-Marie Ahern
Mccarthy, Lebit, Crystal & Liffman
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, October 18, 2021
50 50 order Stipulation & Order Mon 10/18 4:00 PM
Stipulation and Order approving the parties'49 Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/18/2021. (JLG)
Related: [-]
49 49 notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 10/18 10:35 AM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Steward Medical Group, Inc.. (Hyman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]