Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00015
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Apr 04, 2021 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh (1)
Represented By
James Orlando Broccoletti
Zoby & Broccoletti
contact info
Tiffany Brianna Alicia Welch
Whitestone Young PC
contact info
Robert Cooper Whitestone
Whitestone Young
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elizabeth M. Yusi
United States Attorney'S Office - Norfolk
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2021 3:42 AM EDT
Friday, February 08, 2019
1 1 MOTION to Seal Criminal Complaint by USA as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Criminal Complaint as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. ORDERED that the criminal complaint, affidavit in support of the criminal complaint, and arrest warrant are unsealed at the time of the arrest of the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 2/7/19. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
3 3 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of3 Criminal Complaint by USA as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and delivered to USM in case as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
7 7 1 pgs MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs ORDER granting7 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 8/12/20. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
9 9 AFFIDAVIT In Support of Request For Extradition by USA as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh(afar) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 6 pgs Errata D
Thursday, November 12, 2020
10 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Cooper Whitestone appearing for Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh (Whitestone, Robert) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tiffany Brianna Alicia Dean-Groves appearing for Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh (Dean-Groves, Tiffany) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
Set Hearings as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh: Initial Appearance set for 1/26/2021 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (cdod, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh.(Broccoletti, James) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh.(Broccoletti, James) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 ORDER granting12 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. Attorney Robert Whitestone terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/26/2021. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. Attorney Tiffany Welch terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/26/2021. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: Initial Appearance as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh held (Court Reporter FTR). Govt appeared through AUSA Beth Yusi; Deft appeared through attorney Randall Leeman Related [+]. Deft present in custody; advised of rights, charges and right to counsel; consents to remote proceedings. Govt motion for detention; temporary detention ordered. Deft remanded to custody of USM. Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 1/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-] tained
17 17 VTC ORDER as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/26/21. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/26/21. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
19 19 Temporary Detention Order as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/26/21. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
20 20 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/26/21 in case as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
21 21 Pretrial Services Bond REPORT (Initial Pretrial Services Bond Report) (SEALED - government and defense counsel) as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh. (armitage, steve) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
22 22 2 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask: Matter came on for Detention and Preliminary Hearing as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh on 1/29/2021. USA appeared through Beth Yusi, AUSA. Defendant appeared through James Broccoletti, retained. Court inquired of defendant regarding consent to proceed via video. Defendant indicated consent and an Order was entered and filed. Defendant waived preliminary hearing and the Court found probable cause. Government and defense proffer. Argument of counsel. Evidence presented. The Court DENIED the Government's motion for detention and ordered the defendant released on a $10,000 secured bond with special conditions. Defendant remanded to custody of USM pending satisfaction of bond conditions. (Court Reporter FTR.)(jjon) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
23 23 VTC ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/29/21. (jjon) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
24 24 Secured Bond Executed by Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh in amount of $ 10,000, (afar) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh on a $10,000 secured bond with supervision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 2/3/21. (bpet, ) [2:19-mj-00097]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
Set Hearings as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh: Arraignment set for 3/17/2021 at 02:00 PM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
26 26 INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Kathleen Myra Joyce Shehadeh (1) count(s) 1. On motion of the Government, the Court directed arraignment to be set for 3/17/21 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom. (jhie, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet